blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Legal status: EP0992161

Designated contracting states DE 
 ES 
 GB 
 IT 
Examination procedure18.05.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
Entry into regional phase24.01.2000National basic fee paid 
24.01.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
24.01.2000Examination fee paid 
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.01.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
29.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
European patent granted05.09.2001
Opposition procedure22.11.2002Legal effect of revocation of patent published on 16.04.2003 
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:12.04.2000 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A1
Designated State(s):DE ES GB IT
 
Event date:12.04.2000 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED
Effective DATE:20000124
 
Event date:20.12.2000 
Event description:FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED
Effective DATE:20001106
 
Event date:05.09.2001 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:B1
Designated State(s):DE ES GB IT
 
Event date:11.10.2001 
Event description:CORRESPONDS TO:
Ref Document Number:69801583
Country of Ref Document:DE
DATE OF REF DOCUMENT:20011011
Format of Ref Document F/P:P
 
Event date:01.01.2002 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GB IF02
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01
 
Event date:02.01.2002 
Event description:GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)
Effective DATE:20011211
 
Event date:01.02.2002 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG ES FG2A 2163874 ES T3
Code Expl.:+DEFINITIVE PROTECTION
Format of Ref Document F/P:P
 
Event date:12.06.2002 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DE
Payment DATE:20020612
Year of Fee Payment:05
 
Event date:18.06.2002 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GB
Payment DATE:20020618
Year of Fee Payment:05
 
Event date:21.06.2002 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:ES
Payment DATE:20020621
Year of Fee Payment:05
 
Event date:31.07.2002 
Event description:OPPOSITION FILED
Opponent Name:INTERESSENGEMEINSCHAFT FUER RUNDFUNKSCHUTZRECHTE G
Effective DATE:20020605
 
Event date:16.04.2003 
Event description:PATENT REVOKED
Effective DATE:20021122
 
Event date:16.04.2003 
Event description:GB: PATENT REVOKED UNDER ART. 102 OF THE EP CONVENTION DESIGNATING THE UK AS CONTRACTING STATE
Free Format Text:20021122