Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0992161

EP0992161 - METHOD FOR PACKET-LIKE DATA TRANSMISSION BETWEEN A DIGITAL TELEVISION TRANSMITTER AND TELEVISION RECEIVER SETS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  28.02.2003
Database last updated on 24.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip28.02.2003Revocation of patentpublished on 16.04.2003  [2003/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sagem SA
6, Avenue d'Iéna
75116 Paris / FR
[N/P]
Former [2000/15]For all designated states
SAGEM SA
6, Avenue d'Iéna
75116 Paris / FR
Inventor(s)01 / SAGOT, Didier
9, allée des Eguerets
F-95280 Jouy le Moutiers / FR
[2000/15]
Representative(s)Bloch, Gérard
Gevers France
41, Avenue de Friedland
75008 Paris / FR
[N/P]
Former [2000/15]Bloch, Gérard
2, square de l'Avenue du Bois
75116 Paris / FR
Application number, filing date98933736.526.06.1998
[2000/15]
WO1998FR01365
Priority number, dateFR1997000810427.06.1997         Original published format: FR 9708104
[2000/15]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9900987
Date:07.01.1999
Language:FR
[1999/01]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0992161
Date:12.04.2000
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.01.1999
[2000/15]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0992161
Date:05.09.2001
Language:FR
[2001/36]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP07.01.1999
ClassificationInternational:H04N7/52, H04N7/16
[2000/15]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   GB,   IT [2000/15]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR ÜBERTRAGUNG VON DATENPAKETEN ZWISCHEN EINEM DIGITALEN FERNSEHSENDER UND FERNSEHEMPFÄNGERN[2000/15]
English:METHOD FOR PACKET-LIKE DATA TRANSMISSION BETWEEN A DIGITAL TELEVISION TRANSMITTER AND TELEVISION RECEIVER SETS[2000/15]
French:PROCEDE DE TRANSMISSION DE DONNEES EN PAQUETS ENTRE UN EMETTEUR DE TELEVISION NUMERIQUE ET DES RECEPTEURS DE TELEVISION[2000/15]
Entry into regional phase24.01.2000National basic fee paid 
24.01.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
24.01.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure22.01.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
24.01.2000Examination requested  [2000/15]
06.11.2000Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
21.02.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.05.2001Fee for grant paid
18.05.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  05.06.2002   
Interessengemeinschaft für Rundfunkschutzrechte GmbH Schutzrechtsverwertung & Co. KG
Bahnstrasse 62
40210 Düsseldorf / DE
Opponent's representative
Eichstädt, Alfred
Maryniok GbR
Patent- und Rechtsanwaltssozietät
Leibnizstrasse 6
95447 Bayreuth / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2002/31]
Opponent(s)01  05.06.2002   
Interessengemeinschaft für Rundfunkschutzrechte GmbH Schutzrechtsverwertung & Co. KG
Bahnstrasse 62
40210 Düsseldorf / DE
Opponent's representative
Eichstädt, Alfred, Dipl.-Ing.
Maryniok & Eichstädt, Kuhbergstrasse 23
96317 Kronach / DE
11.07.2002Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
30.10.2002Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
12.11.2002Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
22.11.2002Legal effect of revocation of patent [2003/16]
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.01.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
29.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[PX]WO9728652  (TIERNAN COMMUNICATIONS INC [US]) [PX] 1,2 * abstract * * page 22, line 33 - page 24, line 3 *;
 [A]EP0716546  (PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [FR], et al) [A] 1-5 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0714213  (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [A] 1-5 * abstract *;
 [A]EP0735776  (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [A] 1-5 * abstract * * page 1, line 26 - line 51; figures 3A,3B * * figures 13-15,18 *;
 [A]US5515106  (CHANEY JOHN W [US], et al) [A] 1 * abstract *;
 [A]US5600364  (HENDRICKS JOHN S [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 27, line 50 - line 60; figures 10A,10B *
 [A]  - ISO/IEC DIS13818-1 (MPEG 2 PART 1), "CODING OF AUDIO, PICTURE, MULTIMEDIA AND HYPERMEDIA INFORMATION - GENERIC CODING OF MOVING PICTURES AND ASSOCIATED AUDIO INFORMATION - PART1: Systems", ISO/IEC JTC 1/SC 29, INTERNATIONAL STANDARDS ORGANIZATION, (19940610), XP002060689 [A] 1-5 * page 36 - page 45 * * tables 2-26 * * tables 2-29 * * page 106 - page 109; figures F-6 * * page 112 - page 113 *