Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0997028

EP0997028 - FRAUD MONITORING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  30.01.2009
Database last updated on 15.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip30.01.2009Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 04.03.2009  [2009/10]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Azure Solutions Limited
Finsbury Circus House 12-15 Finsbury Circus
London EC2M 7BT / GB
[2005/14]
Former [2004/20]For all designated states
Azure Solutions Limited
Finsbury Square House 12-15 Finsbury House
London EC2M 7BT / GB
Former [2003/34]For all designated states
Azure Solutions Limited
Sirius Building B54 Adastral Park Martlesham Heath
Ipswich, Suffolk IP5 3RE / GB
Former [2000/18]For all designated states
BRITISH TELECOMMUNICATIONS public limited company
81 Newgate Street
London EC1A 7AJ / GB
Inventor(s)01 / EDWARDS, Alexander, Fraser, Miles
8 Hillhouse Road
Ipswich, Suffolk IP3 8AP / GB
[2000/18]
Representative(s)Walaski, Jan Filip , et al
Venner Shipley LLP
200 Aldersgate
London EC1A 4HD / GB
[N/P]
Former [2003/34]Walaski, Jan Filip , et al
Venner, Shipley & Co, 20 Little Britain
London EC1A 7DH / GB
Application number, filing date98933800.915.07.1998
[2000/18]
WO1998GB02078
Priority number, dateGB1997001549722.07.1997         Original published format: GB 9715497
[2000/18]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9905844
Date:04.02.1999
Language:EN
[1999/05]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0997028
Date:03.05.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.02.1999
[2000/18]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP04.02.1999
ClassificationInternational:H04M3/36, H04M15/00
[2000/18]
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IE,   NL [2000/18]
TitleGerman:ÜBERWACHUNGSSYSTEM FÜR BETRÜGERISCHE ANRUFE[2000/18]
English:FRAUD MONITORING SYSTEM[2000/18]
French:SYSTEME DE CONTROLE DE FRAUDES[2005/46]
Former [2000/18]SYSTEME DE CONTROLE DES FRAUDES
Entry into regional phase19.01.2000National basic fee paid 
19.01.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
19.01.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure03.02.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
19.01.2000Examination requested  [2000/18]
23.08.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
01.11.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.11.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
31.03.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.02.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
11.09.2008Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2009/10]
15.10.2008Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2009/10]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
29.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
29.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
24.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
27.07.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
19.07.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
18.07.2006Renewal fee patent year 09
31.07.2007Renewal fee patent year 10
17.10.2008Renewal fee patent year 11
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.200811   M06   Fee paid on   17.10.2008
Cited inInternational search[X]EP0653868  (AT & T CORP [US]) [X] 1-4,6-12,14-18,20-26,28-32,34-37,39-42,44-47,49,50 * claims 1-8 *;
 [XY]US5345595  (JOHNSON ERIC A [US], et al) [X] 1-11,14-25,28 * column 3, line 5 - column 4, line 30 * * column 6, line 37 - column 7, line 20 * * column 9, line 21 - column 10, line 56 * * column 11, line 64 - column 12, line 20 * * figure 1B * [Y] 29-37,39-47,49,50;
 [Y]EP0661863  (AT & T CORP [US]) [Y] 29-37,39-47,49,50 * column 2, line 5 - column 3, line 16 *;
 [X]EP0618713  (AT & T CORP [US]) [X] 1-4,7-9,12,14-18,21-23,26,28-32,34-36,39-42,44-46,49,50 * column 6, line 49 - column 9, line 13 * * figures 3,4 *;
 [A]US5627886  (BOWMAN WILLIAM B [US]) [A] 1-3,7-11,14-17,21-25,28-31,34-37,39-41,44-47,49,50 * column 8, line 20 - column 9, line 7 *;
 [A]WO9631043  (BRITISH TELECOMM [GB], et al)