Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0996686

EP0996686 - BALLPOINT PEN AND INK THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  12.01.2007
Database last updated on 17.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip14.03.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): ES
published on 16.04.2008  [2008/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Berol Corporation
29 E. Stephenson Street
Freeport, IL 61032 / US
[2001/24]
Former [2000/18]For all designated states
THE GILLETTE COMPANY
Prudential Tower Building
Boston, Massachusetts 02199 / US
Inventor(s)01 / CAUSTON, Brian, Edward
Flat 3,9B Sidmouth Street
Reading RG1 4QX / GB
02 / AMBLER, Philip, W.
2 Silwood,Wooden Hill,Bracknell
Berkshire RG12 8WU / GB
03 / MARTIN, Philip, James
Underhayes Farmhouse,Olchard,Ideford
Newton Abbott, Devon TQ12 3GX / GB
[2000/18]
Representative(s)Winkler, Andreas Fritz Ernst , et al
Boehmert & Boehmert
Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB
Pettenkoferstrasse 22
80336 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2002/24]Winkler, Andreas, Dr. , et al
FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22
80336 München / DE
Former [2000/18]Ebner von Eschenbach, Jennifer , et al
c/o Ladas & Parry, Dachauerstrasse 37
80335 München / DE
Application number, filing date98933812.416.07.1998
[2000/18]
WO1998GB02091
Priority number, dateGB1997001512417.07.1997         Original published format: GB 9715124
[2000/18]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO9903934
Date:28.01.1999
Language:EN
[1999/04]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0996686
Date:03.05.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.01.1999
[2000/18]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0996686
Date:08.03.2006
Language:EN
[2006/10]
Search report(s)International search reportEP22.04.1999
ClassificationInternational:C09D11/00
[2000/18]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [2000/18]
TitleGerman:KUGELSCHREIBER UND TINTE DAFÜR[2000/18]
English:BALLPOINT PEN AND INK THEREFOR[2000/18]
French:STYLO BILLE ET SON ENCRE[2000/18]
Entry into regional phase14.02.2000National basic fee paid 
14.02.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
14.02.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure16.02.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
14.02.2000Examination requested  [2000/18]
12.03.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.07.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.06.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.10.2005Fee for grant paid
11.10.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)11.12.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2007/07]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.02.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
12.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
12.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
13.08.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
22.07.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
20.07.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.200306   M06   Fee paid on   13.08.2003
Lapses during opposition  TooltipNL08.03.2006
ES19.06.2006
[2006/50]
Former [2006/45]NL08.03.2006
Cited inInternational search[X]GB805362  (PARKER PEN CO) [X] 1-30;
 [XY]US4606769  (TANAKA NORIATSU [JP], et al) [X] 1 [Y] 18-30;
 [A]US5205838  (DYLLICK-BRENZINGER RAINER [DE], et al) [A] 1-30
 [X]  [X] 1-30
 [X]  [X] 1-17
 [A]  [A] 1-30