Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0990235

EP0990235 - ELECTRICALLY ADDRESSABLE PASSIVE DEVICE, METHOD FOR ELECTRICAL ADDRESSING OF THE SAME AND USES OF THE DEVICE AND THE METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  13.02.2004
Database last updated on 17.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip23.10.2009Change - representativepublished on 25.11.2009  [2009/48]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Thin Film Electronics ASA
P.O. Box 1872 Vika
0124 Oslo / NO
[2000/14]
Inventor(s)01 / GUDESEN, Hans, Gude
Tyrihansveien 5
N-1639 Gamle Fredrikstad / NO
02 / LEISTAD, Geirr, I.
Jongsstubben 19
N-1300 Sandvika / NO
03 / NORDAL, Per-Erik
Bastadryggen 19
N-1370 Asker / NO
 [2003/14]
Former [2000/14]01 / GUDESEN, Hans, Gude
Tyrihansveien 5
N-1639 Gamle Fredrikstad / NO
02 / LEISTAD, Geirr, I.
Jongsstubben 19
N-1300 Sandvika / NO
03 / NORDAL, Per-Erik
B stadryggen 19
N-1370 Asker / NO
Representative(s)Bohnenberger, Johannes , et al
Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte
Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Postfach 86 06 24
81633 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2009/48]Bohnenberger, Johannes , et al
Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR Postfach 86 06 24
81633 München / DE
Former [2000/14]Bohnenberger, Johannes, Dr. , et al
Meissner, Bolte & Partner Postfach 86 06 24
81633 München / DE
Application number, filing date98933982.517.06.1998
[2000/14]
WO1998NO00185
Priority number, dateNO1997000280317.06.1997         Original published format: NO 972803
[2000/14]
Filing languageNO
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO9858383
Date:23.12.1998
Language:EN
[1998/51]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0990235
Date:05.04.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.12.1998
[2000/14]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0990235
Date:09.04.2003
Language:EN
[2003/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:SE01.04.1999
ClassificationInternational:G11C11/42, G11C13/02, H03K19/12, H03K19/14
[2000/14]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   IE,   IT,   LI,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/14]
TitleGerman:ELEKTRISCH ADDRESSIERBARE PASSIVE ANORDNUNG, DAZUGEHÖRIGES ELEKTRISCHES ADRESSIERUNGSVERFAHREN SOWIE VERWENDUNG DER ANORDNUNG UND DES VERFAHRENS[2000/14]
English:ELECTRICALLY ADDRESSABLE PASSIVE DEVICE, METHOD FOR ELECTRICAL ADDRESSING OF THE SAME AND USES OF THE DEVICE AND THE METHOD[2000/14]
French:DISPOSITIF PASSIF ELECTRIQUEMENT ADRESSABLE, PROCEDE D'ADRESSAGE ELECTRIQUE DE CELUI-CI ET UTILISATION DU DISPOSITIF ET MISE EN OEUVRE DU PROCEDE[2000/14]
Entry into regional phase17.06.1998Translation filed 
17.12.1999National basic fee paid 
17.12.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
17.12.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure15.01.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
17.12.1999Examination requested  [2000/14]
30.01.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.06.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.10.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
15.02.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.06.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
10.10.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
18.10.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.12.2002Fee for grant paid
18.12.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)12.01.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/14]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
26.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
26.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipIE17.06.2003
PT09.07.2003
[2004/29]
Former [2004/01]PT09.07.2003
Cited inInternational search[Y]JP03137894  ;
 [Y]JP03137896  ;
 [Y]EP0721189  (NEC CORP [JP]);
 [A]EP0395886  (OLYMPUS OPTICAL CO [JP]);
 [A]US5592409  (NISHIMURA KIYOSHI [JP], et al);
 [A]JP04145664
 [X]  - VACCUM, Volume 43, No. 11, 1992, Z.Y. HUA et al., "A New Material for Optical, Electrical and Electronic Thin Films Memories", pages 1019-1023.,
 [Y]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Vol. 15, No. 360, (P-1250); & JP 03137894 A (MATSUSHITA GIKEN K.K.) 12 June 1991.,
 [Y]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Vol. 15, No. 360, (P-1250); & JP 03137896 A (MATSUSHITA GIKEN K.K.) 12 June 1991.,
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Vol. 16, No. 423, (E-1260); & JP 04145664 A (CANON INC.) 19 May 1992.,