Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1009923

EP1009923 - DEVICE AND METHOD FOR REDUCTION OF HARMFUL EMISSIONS FROM A COMBUSTION ENGINE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  21.06.2002
Database last updated on 16.06.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip21.06.2002Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 07.08.2002  [2002/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Volvo Personvagnar AB
405 08 Göteborg / SE
[N/P]
Former [2000/25]For all designated states
Volvo Personvagnar AB
405 08 Göteborg / SE
Inventor(s)01 / WIRMARK, Göran
Kung Sverres gata 48
S-417 28 Göteborg / SE
02 / GOTTBERG, Ingemar
Kaprifolgatan 43
S-426 69 Västra Frölunda / SE
03 / LINNA, Jan, Roger
48 Clearway Street No. 6
Boston, MA 02115 / US
04 / ANDERSSON, Lennart
Sörgaardsgatan 9
S-431 67 Mölndal / SE
[2000/25]
Representative(s)Andersson, Per Rune
Zacco Sweden AB
P.O. Box 5581
114 85 Stockholm / SE
[N/P]
Former [2000/25]Andersson, Per Rune
Albihns Patentbyra Göteborg AB P.O. Box 142
401 22 Göteborg / SE
Application number, filing date98934110.217.07.1998
[2000/25]
WO1998SE01396
Priority number, dateSE1997000275718.07.1997         Original published format: SE 9702757
[2000/25]
Filing languageSV
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9904145
Date:28.01.1999
Language:EN
[1999/04]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1009923
Date:21.06.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.01.1999
[2000/25]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:SE28.01.1999
ClassificationInternational:F01N3/20
[2000/25]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/25]
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERRINGERUNG DES SCHADSTOFFAUSSTOSSES IN EINER BRENNKRAFTMASCHINE[2000/25]
English:DEVICE AND METHOD FOR REDUCTION OF HARMFUL EMISSIONS FROM A COMBUSTION ENGINE[2000/25]
French:DISPOSITIF ET PROCEDE PERMETTANT DE REDUIRE LES EMISSIONS NOCIVES D'UN MOTEUR A COMBUSTION INTERNE[2000/25]
Entry into regional phase28.01.1999Translation filed 
14.01.2000National basic fee paid 
14.01.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
14.01.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure08.02.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE
14.01.2000Examination requested  [2000/25]
06.06.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
01.02.2002Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2002/32]
08.03.2002Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2002/32]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.07.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.200104   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[A]WO9611330  (TEXAS A & M UNIV SYS [US], et al);
 [A]DE4132440  (EMITEC EMISSIONSTECHNOLOGIE [DE]);
 [A]US5623987  (GOLBEN P MARK [US], et al);
 [A]WO9638658  (VOLVO AB [SE])
Examination US5155995