Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1007922

EP1007922 - TEMPERATURE MEASUREMENT WITH INTERLEAVED BI-LEVEL CURRENT ON A DIODE AND BI-LEVEL CURRENT SOURCE THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  20.05.2005
Database last updated on 16.06.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip05.09.2008Change - representativepublished on 08.10.2008  [2008/41]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MAXIM INTEGRATED PRODUCTS
120 San Gabriel Drive Sunnyvale
California 94086 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/24]For all designated states
MAXIM INTEGRATED PRODUCTS
120 San Gabriel Drive
Sunnyvale California 94086 / US
Inventor(s)01 / LOCASCIO, James, Jason
6881 Hampton Drive
San Jose, CA 95120 / US
02 / THURBER, Charles, Raymond, Jr.
676 Smoke Tree Way
Sunnyvale, CA 94086 / US
[2000/24]
Representative(s)Wombwell, Francis , et al
Forresters
15, Hamilton Square
Birkenhead
Merseyside CH41 6BR / GB
[N/P]
Former [2008/41]Wombwell, Francis , et al
Potts, Kerr & Co. 15, Hamilton Square Birkenhead
Merseyside CH41 6BR / GB
Former [2000/24]Wombwell, Francis , et al
Potts, Kerr & Co. 15, Hamilton Square
Birkenhead Merseyside CH41 6BR / GB
Application number, filing date98934155.719.06.1998
[2000/24]
WO1998US12884
Priority number, dateUS1997088512430.06.1997         Original published format: US 885124
[2000/24]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9900650
Date:07.01.1999
Language:EN
[1999/01]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1007922
Date:14.06.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.01.1999
[2000/24]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP07.01.1999
ClassificationInternational:G01K7/01, G01K3/10
[2000/24]
Designated contracting statesDE,   GB [2000/24]
TitleGerman:TEMPERATURMESSUNG MIT ABWECHSELNDEM ZWEIPEGELSTROM DURCH EINE DIODE UND ZWEIPEGELSTROMQUELLE DAFÜR[2000/24]
English:TEMPERATURE MEASUREMENT WITH INTERLEAVED BI-LEVEL CURRENT ON A DIODE AND BI-LEVEL CURRENT SOURCE THEREFOR[2000/24]
French:MESURE DE TEMPERATURE AVEC COURANT A DEUX NIVEAUX ENTRELACES SUR UNE DIODE, SOURCE DE COURANT A DEUX NIVEAUX POUR CE PROCEDE[2000/24]
Entry into regional phase28.01.2000National basic fee paid 
28.01.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
28.01.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure20.01.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
28.01.2000Examination requested  [2000/24]
03.01.2005Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2005/27]
04.02.2005Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2005/27]
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
06.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
28.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
04.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.06.200407   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[X]US4636092  (HEGYI DENNIS J [US]) [X] 1-9 * column 6, line 66 - column 8, line 68 * * column 11, line 34 - column 12, line 28; figure 4 *;
 [X]NL1000222C  (STICHTING TECH WETENSCHAPP [NL]) [X] 1-9 * page 7, line 7 - page 11, line 9; figures 4-6 *;
 [A]US4224537  (GLAZER MARVIN A) [A] 1,9,14,19 * the whole document *