blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0996973 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0996973



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 234
22.03.2011 CDS Clean up - amended applicant details Search / examination 1
08.06.2006 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
22.05.2006 Closing of application Search / examination 1
07.02.2006 Application deemed to be withdrawn (non-payment of renewal fee) Search / examination 1
03.08.2005 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 1
15.05.2000 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
11.04.2000 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
27.03.2000 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
22.03.2000 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
08.02.2000 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
08.02.2000 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
08.02.2000 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
31.01.2000 Annex Search / examination 2
31.01.2000 Claims Search / examination 5
31.01.2000 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
31.01.2000 Description Search / examination 18
31.01.2000 Drawings Search / examination 6
31.01.2000 Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure Search / examination 1
16.12.1999 Annex Search / examination 52
16.12.1999 Annex Search / examination 6
16.12.1999 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
16.12.1999 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
16.12.1999 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 6
16.03.1999 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
22.01.1999 Priority document Search / examination 34
22.01.1999 Priority document Search / examination 48
29.12.1998 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
29.12.1998 International publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 31