blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0996973


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
19.05.2006 Application deemed to be withdrawn published on  21.06.2006  [2006/25]
01.02.2006 New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit
30.07.2005 New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit
16.06.2004 New entry: Renewal fee paid
06.06.2003 Renewal fee
26.06.2002 Renewal fee
16.05.2001 Renewal fee
02.06.2000 Change - inventor published on  19.07.2000 [2000/29]
10.05.2000 Renewal fee
17.03.2000 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  03.05.2000 [2000/18]
17.03.2000 Request for examination filed published on  03.05.2000 [2000/18]
10.03.2000 PCT data prior to European publication
03.02.2000 PCT data prior to European publication
23.12.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
26.03.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
11.03.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
02.10.1998 PCT data prior to European publication