blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP0996973 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

EP98934178 EP99933997



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
WO0004574Global Dossier 27.01.2000A1
Priority number Date
US11483998 14.07.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP2002520876Global Dossier 09.07.2002A
Priority number Date
US11483998 14.07.1998
US9915877 13.07.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP4675439BGlobal Dossier 20.04.2011B2
JP2002507327 05.03.2002A
Priority number Date
US9813305 26.06.1998
US6742998 27.04.1998
US88481197 30.06.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP1103068Global Dossier 30.05.2001A1
Priority number Date
US11483998 14.07.1998
US9915877 13.07.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP0996973Global Dossier 03.05.2000A1
Priority number Date
US9813305 26.06.1998
US6742998 27.04.1998
US88481197 30.06.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
TW439123B 07.06.2001B
Priority number Date
US11483998 14.07.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US6162715 19.12.2000A
Priority number Date
US11483998 14.07.1998
US88481197 30.06.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US6251190 26.06.2001B1
Priority number Date
US11483998 14.07.1998
US65788000 08.09.2000
US88481197 30.06.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US6309713 30.10.2001B1
Priority number Date
US88481197 30.06.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2001016429 23.08.2001A1
Priority number Date
US88481197 30.06.1997
US75500901 05.01.2001
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO9900830Global Dossier 07.01.1999A1
Priority number Date
US6742998 27.04.1998
US88481197 30.06.1997
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
KR20010014314 26.02.2001A
Priority number Date
US6742998 27.04.1998
US88481197 30.06.1997
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
TW432529B 01.05.2001B
Priority number Date
US6742998 27.04.1998
US88481197 30.06.1997
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
US6872429 29.03.2005B1
Priority number Date
US6742998 27.04.1998
US88481197 30.06.1997