Extract from the Register of European Patents

Legal status: EP0996973

Designated contracting statesBE 
CH 
DE 
FR 
GB 
IE 
LI 
NL 
Examination procedure07.02.2006Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2006/25]
Entry into regional phase16.12.1999National basic fee paid 
16.12.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
16.12.1999Examination fee paid 
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.05.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
04.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
14.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
23.05.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
04.06.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.06.200508   M06   Not yet paid
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:03.05.2000 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A1
Designated State(s):BE CH DE FR GB IE LI NL
 
Event date:03.05.2000 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED
Effective DATE:19991216
 
Event date:19.07.2000 
Event description:INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED)
INVENTOR NAME:CHEN, LING
 
Event date:19.07.2000 
Event description:INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED)
INVENTOR NAME:GANGULI, SESHADRI
 
Event date:19.07.2000 
Event description:INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED)
INVENTOR NAME:MAK, ALFRED
 
Event date:21.06.2006 
Event description:APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN
Effective DATE:20051231