Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0996973

EP0996973 - IMPROVED DEPOSITION OF TUNGSTEN NITRIDE USING PLASMA PRETREATMENT IN A CHEMICAL VAPOR DEPOSITION CHAMBER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  19.05.2006
Database last updated on 17.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip19.05.2006Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 21.06.2006  [2006/25]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Applied Materials, Inc.
3050 Bowers Avenue
Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/18]For all designated states
Applied Materials, Inc.
3050 Bowers Avenue
Santa Clara, California 95054 / US
Inventor(s)01 / CHEN, Ling
784 Dartshire Way
Sunnyvale, CA 94087 / US
02 / GANGULI, Seshadri
713 Golden Oak Drive
Sunnyvale, CA 94086 / US
03 / MAK, Alfred
32722 Fellows Court
Union City, CA 94587 / US
[2000/29]
Former [2000/18]01 / CHEN, Ling
784 Dartshire Way
Sunnyvale, CA 94087 / US
02 / GANGULI, Seshadri
Apartment 150 3480 Grenada Avenue
Santa Clara, CA 95051 / US
03 / MAK, Alfred
32722 Fellows Court
Union City, CA 94587 / US
Representative(s)Bayliss, Geoffrey Cyril , et al
BOULT WADE TENNANT
Verulam Gardens
70 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8BT / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/18]Bayliss, Geoffrey Cyril , et al
BOULT WADE TENNANT, Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8BT / GB
Application number, filing date98934178.926.06.1998
[2000/18]
WO1998US13305
Priority number, dateUS1997088481130.06.1997         Original published format: US 884811
US1998006742927.04.1998         Original published format: US 67429
[2000/18]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9900830
Date:07.01.1999
Language:EN
[1999/01]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0996973
Date:03.05.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.01.1999
[2000/18]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP07.01.1999
ClassificationInternational:H01L21/285, C23C16/34, C23C16/52
[2000/18]
Designated contracting statesBE,   CH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IE,   LI,   NL [2000/18]
TitleGerman:VERBESSERTE ABSCHEIDUNG VON WOLFRAMNITRID DURCH PLASMAVORBEHANDLUNG IN EINEM CVD REAKTOR[2000/18]
English:IMPROVED DEPOSITION OF TUNGSTEN NITRIDE USING PLASMA PRETREATMENT IN A CHEMICAL VAPOR DEPOSITION CHAMBER[2000/18]
French:DEPOT AMELIORE DE NITRURE DE TUNGSTENE AU MOYEN D'UN PRETRAITEMENT AU PLASMA DANS UNE CHAMBRE DE DEPOT CHIMIQUE EN PHASE VAPEUR[2000/18]
Entry into regional phase16.12.1999National basic fee paid 
16.12.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
16.12.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure27.01.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
16.12.1999Examination requested  [2000/18]
31.12.2005Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2006/25]
07.02.2006Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2006/25]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.05.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
04.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
14.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
23.05.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
04.06.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.06.200508   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[X]JPS645015  ;
 [X]JPS63317676  ;
 [X]US5356835  (SOMEKH SASSON [US], et al) [X] 1-6,8,9 * column 6, line 10 - line 20 *;
 [X]EP0778358  (APPLIED MATERIALS INC [US]) [X] 27-30 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0711846  (APPLIED MATERIALS INC [US]) [A] * table 2 *;
 [A]US5232872  (OHBA TAKAYUKI [JP]) [A] * the whole document *;
 [PX]EP0840363  (TEXAS INSTRUMENTS INC [US]) [PX] 1-4,18,20-26 * figure 1 *;
 [PX]EP0841690  (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [PX] 1-5,14-17,20,21,24-26 * column 4, line 30 - column 5, line 31 *;
 [PX]US5648175  (RUSSELL KATHLEEN [US], et al) [PX] 27-30 * the whole document *
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890424), vol. 013, no. 173, Database accession no. (E - 748), [X] 1-4,15-17,20,21,24-26 * abstract *
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890421), vol. 013, no. 169, Database accession no. (C - 587), [X] 1-6,15,16,20-22,25,26 * abstract *
 [PX]  - LU J P ET AL, "A new process for depositing tungsten nitride thin films", JOURNAL OF THE ELECTROCHEMICAL SOCIETY, FEB. 1998, ELECTROCHEM. SOC, USA, ISSN 0013-4651, vol. 145, no. 2, pages L21 - L23, XP002079461 [PX] 1-4,10-21,24-26 * the whole document *