Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0990059

EP0990059 - LOW TEMPERATURE CHEMICAL VAPOR DEPOSITION PROCESS FOR FORMING BISMUTH-CONTAINING CERAMIC THIN FILMS USEFUL IN FERROELECTRIC MEMORY DEVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  08.08.2008
Database last updated on 24.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip28.08.2009Change - representativepublished on 30.09.2009  [2009/40]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ADVANCED TECHNOLOGY MATERIALS, INC.
7 Commerce Drive
Danbury, CT 06810 / US
For all designated states
Infineon Technologies AG
St.-Martin-Strasse 53
81669 München / DE
[2007/40]
Former [2005/26]For all designated states
ADVANCED TECHNOLOGY MATERIALS, INC.
7 Commerce Drive
Danbury, CT 06810 / US
For all designated states
Infineon Technologies AG
St.-Martin-Strasse 53
81669 München / DE
Former [2000/14]For all designated states
ADVANCED TECHNOLOGY MATERIALS, INC.
7 Commerce Drive
Danbury, CT 06810 / US
For all designated states
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
St Martin Strasse 76
81541 München / DE
Inventor(s)01 / HINTERMAIER, Frank, S.
Lipowskystrasse 19
D-81373 Munich / DE
02 / DEHM, Christine
Oefelestrasse 14
D-81543 Munich / DE
03 / HOENLEIN, Wolfgang
Parkstrasse 8a
D-82008 Unterhaching / DE
04 / VAN BUSKIRK, Peter, C.
18 Poverty Hollow Road
Newtown, CT 06470 / US
05 / ROEDER, Jeffrey, F.
4 Longmeadow Hill Road
Brookfield, CT 06804 / US
06 / HENDRIX, Bryan, C.
Apartment 409, 79 Park Avenue
Danbury, CT 06810 / US
07 / BAUM, Thomas, H.
2 Handol Lane
New Fairfield, CT 06812 / US
08 / DESROCHERS, Debra, A.
756 Federal Road
Brookfield, CT 06804 / US
 [2007/40]
Former [2000/14]01 / HINTERMAIER, Frank, S.
Lipowskystrasse 19
D-81373 Munich / DE
02 / DEHM, Christine
Oefelestra 14
D-81543 Munich / DE
03 / HOENLEIN, Wolfgang
Parkstrasse 8a
D-82008 Untorhaching / DE
04 / VAN BUSKIRK, Peter, C.
18 Poverty Hollow Road
Newtown, CT 06470 / US
05 / ROEDER, Jeffrey, F.
4 Longmeadow Hill Road
Brookfield, CT 06804 / US
06 / HENDRIX, Bryan, C.
Apartment 409, 79 Park Avenue
Danbury, CT 06810 / US
07 / BAUM, Thomas, H.
2 Handol Lane
New Fairfield, CT 06812 / US
08 / DESROCHERS, Debra, A.
756 Federal Road
Brookfield, CT 06804 / US
Representative(s)Castell, Klaus
Patentanwaltskanzlei
Liermann-Castell
Am Rurufer 2
52349 Düren / DE
[N/P]
Former [2009/40]Castell, Klaus
Patentanwaltskanzlei Liermann - Castell Gutenbergstrasse 12
52349 Düren / DE
Former [2000/14]Castell, Klaus, Dr.
Gutenbergstrasse 12
52349 Düren / DE
Application number, filing date98934193.826.06.1998
[2000/14]
WO1998US13470
Priority number, dateUS19970050081P26.06.1997         Original published format: US 50081 P
US1997097508720.11.1997         Original published format: US 975087
[2000/14]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9900530
Date:07.01.1999
Language:EN
[1999/01]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0990059
Date:05.04.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.01.1999
[2000/14]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0990059
Date:03.10.2007
Language:EN
[2007/40]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US07.01.1999
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP15.09.2000
ClassificationInternational:C23C16/00, B32B9/00, C23C16/40, C23C16/56
[2000/44]
Former International [2000/14]C23C16/00, B32B9/00
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2000/14]
TitleGerman:NIEDRIG TEMPERATUR CVD-VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON WISMUTH ENTHALTENDEN DÜNNEN KERAMIK-SCHICHTEN ZUR VERWENDUNG IN FERROELEKTRISCHEN SPEICHERANORDNUNGEN[2000/14]
English:LOW TEMPERATURE CHEMICAL VAPOR DEPOSITION PROCESS FOR FORMING BISMUTH-CONTAINING CERAMIC THIN FILMS USEFUL IN FERROELECTRIC MEMORY DEVICES[2000/14]
French:PROCEDE DE DEPOT CHIMIQUE EN PHASE VAPEUR BASSE TEMPERATURE SERVANT A FORMER DE MINCES FILMS DE CERAMIQUE CONTENANT DU BISMUTH UTILES DANS DES DISPOSITIFS A MEMOIRES FERROELECTRIQUES[2000/14]
Entry into regional phase24.12.1999National basic fee paid 
24.12.1999Search fee paid 
24.12.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
24.12.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure21.01.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
23.12.1999Request for accelerated examination filed
24.12.1999Examination requested  [2000/14]
29.11.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
29.11.2000Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes
14.02.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.03.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.06.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.07.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.11.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.12.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
09.04.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.06.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.09.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.05.2003Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
23.02.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.05.2005Fee for grant paid
24.05.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Appeal following examination14.07.2003Appeal received No.  T0935/03
21.07.2003Statement of grounds filed
06.05.2004Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M03) [2004/19]
07.07.2004Date of receipt of observations in an appeal [2004/28]
15.09.2004Result of appeal procedure: continuation of examination procedure
Opposition(s)04.07.2008No opposition filed within time limit [2008/37]
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
11.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
27.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
17.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
30.06.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
30.06.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
02.01.2007Renewal fee patent year 09
28.06.2007Renewal fee patent year 10
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.06.200609   M06   Fee paid on   02.01.2007
Documents cited:Search[A]US5431957  (GARDINER ROBIN A [US], et al) [A] 20 * column 5, line 19 - line 41 *;
 [A]US4975299  (MIR JOSE M [US], et al) [A] 21 * column 10, line 36 - line 56 *
 [X]  - TINGKAI LI ET AL, "Surface structure and morphology of SrBi/sub 2/Ta/sub 2/O/sub 9/ (SBT) thin films", STRUCTURE AND EVOLUTION OF SURFACES. SYMPOSIUM, STRUCTURE AND EVOLUTION OF SURFACES. SYMPOSIUM, BOSTON, MA, USA, 2-5 DEC. 1996, 1997, Pittsburgh, PA, USA, Mater. Res. Soc, USA, ISBN 1-55899-344-4, pages 407 - 412, XP000900949 [X] 37,42 * abstract *
International search[X]US5478610  (DESU SESHU B [US], et al);
 [A]US5648114  (PAZ DE ARAUJO CARLOS A [US], et al);
 [A]US5519566  (PERINO STANLEY [US], et al)