Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1018873

EP1018873 - NATURAL INSECT AND ARTHROPOD REPELLENT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  02.07.2004
Database last updated on 13.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip24.09.2004Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): ES
published on 10.11.2004  [2004/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Reifenrath, William G.
1315 So. 46th Street
Richmond, CA 94806 / US
[2000/29]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[2000/29]
Representative(s)Allard, Susan Joyce , et al
BOULT WADE TENNANT, Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8BT / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/29]Allard, Susan Joyce , et al
BOULT WADE TENNANT, Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8BT / GB
Application number, filing date98934237.330.06.1998
[2000/29]
WO1998US13775
Priority number, dateUS19970051320P30.06.1997         Original published format: US 51320 P
US1998010770030.06.1998         Original published format: US 107700
[2000/29]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9900014
Date:07.01.1999
Language:EN
[1999/01]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1018873
Date:19.07.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.01.1999
[2000/29]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1018873
Date:27.08.2003
Language:EN
[2003/35]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US07.01.1999
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.12.2000
ClassificationInternational:A01N31/00, A01N37/02, A01N37/06
[2001/06]
Former International [2000/29]A01N31/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/29]
TitleGerman:NATÜRLICHES INSEKTEN- UND ARTHROPODENVERTREIBUNGSMITTEL[2000/29]
English:NATURAL INSECT AND ARTHROPOD REPELLENT[2000/29]
French:REPULSIF NATUREL CONTRE LES INSECTES ET LES ARTHROPODES[2000/29]
Entry into regional phase31.01.2000National basic fee paid 
31.01.2000Search fee paid 
31.01.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
31.01.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure12.01.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
31.01.2000Examination requested  [2000/29]
23.05.2001Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
06.02.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.05.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.12.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.04.2003Fee for grant paid
25.04.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)28.05.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/34]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
06.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
24.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
23.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT27.08.2003
BE27.08.2003
CH27.08.2003
FI27.08.2003
LI27.08.2003
NL27.08.2003
DK27.11.2003
GR27.11.2003
SE27.11.2003
ES08.12.2003
PT27.01.2004
[2004/46]
Former [2004/31]AT27.08.2003
BE27.08.2003
CH27.08.2003
FI27.08.2003
LI27.08.2003
NL27.08.2003
DK27.11.2003
GR27.11.2003
SE27.11.2003
PT27.01.2004
Former [2004/29]AT27.08.2003
BE27.08.2003
CH27.08.2003
FI27.08.2003
LI27.08.2003
NL27.08.2003
DK27.11.2003
GR27.11.2003
SE27.11.2003
Former [2004/28]AT27.08.2003
BE27.08.2003
CH27.08.2003
FI27.08.2003
LI27.08.2003
NL27.08.2003
GR27.11.2003
SE27.11.2003
Former [2004/22]AT27.08.2003
CH27.08.2003
FI27.08.2003
LI27.08.2003
NL27.08.2003
GR27.11.2003
SE27.11.2003
Former [2004/16]AT27.08.2003
FI27.08.2003
NL27.08.2003
GR27.11.2003
SE27.11.2003
Former [2004/14]AT27.08.2003
FI27.08.2003
NL27.08.2003
GR27.11.2003
Former [2004/13]FI27.08.2003
NL27.08.2003
Former [2004/12]FI27.08.2003
Documents cited:Search[XY]US3668226  (QUINTANA RONALD P, et al) [X] 1-4,6,10-12,25 * Column 1, lines 9 to 75, column 2, lines 5-7, column 3, lines 11-16, column 7, line 5 to column 8, line 21 * [Y] 1-66;
 [X]US5589181  (BENCSITS FRANZ [CH]) [X] 1-66 * Column 1, line 33 -column 2, line 40, column 3, lines 1-9, claims *;
 [A]US4202129  (GREENBERG JACK [US]) [A] 1-66 * the whole document *
International search[Y]  - KING W. V., "MOSQUITO REPELLENTS.", AGRICULTURE HANDBOOK, XX, XX, XX, (19540101), no. 69., pages 13 - 16 + 101 + 105 + 251., XP002914461
 [Y]  - "HUMAN SKIN-SURFACE LIPID FATTY ACIDS - MOSQUITO REPELLENTS.", EXPERIENTIA., Springer Basel AG, CH, CH, (19700101), vol. 26., ISSN 0014-4754, pages 728 - 730., XP002914462
 [Y]  - REIFENRATH W. G., ET AL., "EVAPORATION AND SKIN PENETRATION CHARACTERISTICS OF MOSQUITO REPELLENT FORMULATIONS.", Journal of the American Mosquito Control Association : Mosquito news, American Mosquito Control Association � Mount Laurel, NJ : Assoc.,, US, US, (19890301), vol. 05., no. 01., ISSN 8756-971X, pages 45 - 51., XP002914463