Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1061822

EP1061822 - FACE SEAL FOR RESPIRATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  06.02.2004
Database last updated on 22.06.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip25.07.2008Change - representativepublished on 27.08.2008  [2008/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY
3M Center, P.O. Box 33427
St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/52]For all designated states
MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY
3M Center, P.O. Box 33427
St. Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US
Inventor(s)01 / BURNS, James, A.
P.O. Box 33427
Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US
02 / BROSTROM, Gerald, M.
P.O. Box 33427
Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US
[2000/52]
Representative(s)Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/35]Vossius & Partner
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
Former [2000/52]VOSSIUS & PARTNER
Siebertstrasse 4
81675 München / DE
Application number, filing date98934307.408.07.1998
[2000/52]
WO1998US14096
Priority number, dateUS1998003763110.03.1998         Original published format: US 37631
[2000/52]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9945808
Date:16.09.1999
Language:EN
[1999/37]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1061822
Date:27.12.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.09.1999
[2000/52]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1061822
Date:02.04.2003
Language:EN
[2003/14]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP16.09.1999
ClassificationInternational:A42B3/22, A42B3/10, A62B18/08
[2000/52]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [2000/52]
TitleGerman:GESICHTSDICHTUNG FÜR ATEMSCHUTZGERÄT[2000/52]
English:FACE SEAL FOR RESPIRATOR[2000/52]
French:ECRAN FACIAL POUR RESPIRATEUR[2000/52]
Entry into regional phase29.09.2000National basic fee paid 
29.09.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
29.09.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure08.09.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
29.09.2000Examination requested  [2000/52]
08.06.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
18.12.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.05.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
20.09.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.11.2002Fee for grant paid
11.11.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)05.01.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/13]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
25.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
22.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[A]GB1402287  (STADIUM LTD) [A] 1,5-10,12-14 * page 1, line 47 - page 2, line 22 * * figure -; claim - *;
 [A]US3806951  (HALTEMAN S) [A] 1,3,5-13 * column 1, line 14 - line 42 * * column 2, line 1 - column 3, line 23 * * figure - *;
 [DA]US4280491  (BERG RICHARD C, et al);
 [DA]US4136688  (GORMAN ANTHONY G);
 [A]GB2310585  (THETFORD MOULDED PROD LTD [GB])