Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0993576

EP0993576 - HIGH PRESSURE GAS FITTING WITH NON-ROTATABLE FEATURES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  30.08.2002
Database last updated on 20.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip30.08.2002No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 16.10.2002  [2002/42]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
PARKER HANNIFIN CORPORATION
6035 Parkland Boulevard
Cleveland, OH 44124-4141 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/16]For all designated states
Parker Hannifin Corporation
6035 Parkland Boulevard
Cleveland, OH 44124-4141 / US
Inventor(s)01 / ALBRIGHT, John
26 Evelyn Place
Nutly, NJ 07110 / US
02 / BARBER, Patrick, P.
37 Fox Ledge Road
Kinnelon, NJ 07405 / US
03 / SAWYER, Kenneth, W.
P.O. Box 923
Sparta, NJ 07871 / US
04 / ALDRIDGE, Lewis, L.
30 Pondview Road
Parsippany-Troy Hills TWP, NJ 07054 / US
[2000/16]
Representative(s)Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Friedenheimer Brücke 21
80639 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/16]Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte
Grafinger Strasse 2
81671 München / DE
Application number, filing date98934313.208.07.1998
[2000/16]
WO1998US14139
Priority number, dateUS19970052290P11.07.1997         Original published format: US 52290 P
US19970052294P11.07.1997         Original published format: US 52294 P
[2000/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9902911
Date:21.01.1999
Language:EN
[1999/03]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0993576
Date:19.04.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.01.1999
[2000/16]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0993576
Date:24.10.2001
Language:EN
[2001/43]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP21.01.1999
ClassificationInternational:F16L19/02
[2000/16]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2000/16]
TitleGerman:GEGEN DREHUNG GESICHERTE HOCHDRUCK-GASARMATUR[2001/17]
English:HIGH PRESSURE GAS FITTING WITH NON-ROTATABLE FEATURES[2000/16]
French:RACCORD POUR CONDUIT DE GAZ HAUTE PRESSION SANS ROTATION[2000/16]
Former [2000/16]GEGEN DREHUNG GESICHTERTER HOCHDRUCK-GASARMATUR
Entry into regional phase13.01.2000National basic fee paid 
13.01.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
13.01.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure28.01.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
13.01.2000Examination requested  [2000/16]
19.03.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
27.04.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.07.2001Fee for grant paid
26.07.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)25.07.2002No opposition filed within time limit [2002/42]
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.07.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
27.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[A]US3764169  (ST CLAIR T) [A] 1,2 * column 2, line 22 - line 36; figure 3 *;
 [A]US5060987  (MILLER ROBERT [US]) [A] 1,2,6,7,9-11 * figure 1 *;
 [AD]US5350205  (ALDRIDGE LEWIS L [US], et al) [AD] 1,6,11 * figures 1,3 *