blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0993576 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0993576



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 168
28.08.2002 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
13.09.2001 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
26.07.2001 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
26.07.2001 Translation of the claims Search / examination 4
26.07.2001 Translation of the claims Search / examination 3
27.04.2001 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 3
11.04.2001 Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
19.03.2001 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
19.03.2001 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 3
19.03.2001 Text intended for grant Search / examination 26
08.03.2000 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
06.03.2000 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
23.02.2000 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
03.02.2000 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
03.02.2000 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
03.02.2000 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
03.02.2000 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
13.01.2000 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
30.04.1999 International preliminary examination report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 8
24.03.1999 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
18.02.1999 Notification of documents sent to WIPO PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
18.02.1999 Notification of receipt of demand PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
05.02.1999 Priority document Search / examination 18
05.02.1999 Priority document Search / examination 16
28.01.1999 PCT demand form PCT Chapter 2 procedure 5
14.01.1999 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
14.01.1999 International publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 28
08.07.1998 Claims International Searching Authority 3
08.07.1998 Description International Searching Authority 17
08.07.1998 Drawings International Searching Authority 6