blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0993576


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
30.08.2002 No opposition filed within time limit published on  16.10.2002  [2002/42]
07.09.2001 (Expected) grant published on  24.10.2001 [2001/43]
09.08.2001 Renewal fee
02.08.2001 Communication of intention to grant a patent
24.04.2001 Communication of intention to grant
24.04.2001 Communication of intention to grant a patent
17.03.2001 First examination report
13.03.2001 Communication of intention to grant
09.03.2001 Change - German title published on  25.04.2001 [2001/17]
28.07.2000 Renewal fee
03.03.2000 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  19.04.2000 [2000/16]
03.03.2000 Request for examination filed published on  19.04.2000 [2000/16]
01.02.2000 PCT data prior to European publication
27.01.2000 PCT data prior to European publication
18.03.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
03.03.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
02.10.1998 PCT data prior to European publication