blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP0993576
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP3894233BGlobal Dossier 14.03.2007B2
JP2002511919 16.04.2002A
Priority number Date
US5229097 11.07.1997
US9814139 08.07.1998
US5229497 11.07.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP0993576Global Dossier 24.10.2001B1
EP0993576 19.04.2000A1
Priority number Date
US5229097 11.07.1997
US9814139 08.07.1998
US5229497 11.07.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DE69802192T 11.07.2002T2
DE69802192D 29.11.2001D1
Priority number Date
US5229097 11.07.1997
US9814139 08.07.1998
US5229497 11.07.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US6382683 07.05.2002B1
Priority number Date
US45814699 09.12.1999
US5229097 11.07.1997
US5229497 11.07.1997
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO9902911Global Dossier 21.01.1999A1
Priority number Date
US5229097 11.07.1997
US5229497 11.07.1997