blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Legal status: EP0993576

Designated contracting states DE 
 FR 
 GB 
 IT 
Examination procedure26.07.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
Entry into regional phase13.01.2000National basic fee paid 
13.01.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
13.01.2000Examination fee paid 
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.07.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
27.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
European patent granted24.10.2001
Opposition procedure25.07.2002No opposition filed within time limit published on 16.10.2002 
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:19.04.2000 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A1
Designated State(s):DE FR GB IT
 
Event date:19.04.2000 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED
Effective DATE:20000113
 
Event date:02.05.2001 
Event description:FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED
Effective DATE:20010319
 
Event date:24.10.2001 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:B1
Designated State(s):DE FR GB IT
 
Event date:29.11.2001 
Event description:CORRESPONDS TO:
Ref Document Number:69802192
Country of Ref Document:DE
DATE OF REF DOCUMENT:20011129
Format of Ref Document F/P:P
 
Event date:01.01.2002 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GB IF02
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01
 
Event date:04.01.2002 
Event description:FR: TRANSLATION FILED
 
Event date:16.10.2002 
Event description:NO OPPOSITION FILED
 
Event date:31.10.2012 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GB
Payment DATE:20120725
Year of Fee Payment:15
 
Event date:31.12.2012 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DE
Payment DATE:20120727
Year of Fee Payment:15
 
Event date:31.12.2012 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:IT
Payment DATE:20120724
Year of Fee Payment:15
 
Event date:31.12.2012 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FR
Payment DATE:20120731
Year of Fee Payment:15
 
Event date:26.03.2014 
Event description:GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE
Effective DATE:20130708
 
Event date:25.04.2014 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR ST
Code Expl.:-NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE
Effective DATE:20140331
 
Event date:30.04.2014 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DE
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20140201
 
Event date:30.04.2014 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GB
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20130708
 
Event date:08.05.2014 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R119 69802192 DE
Code Expl.:-APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE
Effective DATE:20140201
 
Event date:30.05.2014 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:IT
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20130708
 
Event date:30.05.2014 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FR
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20130731