Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0998543

EP0998543 - ELECTROCHEMICAL HYDROGEN COMPRESSOR WITH ELECTROCHEMICAL AUTOTHERMAL REFORMER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  10.10.2003
Database last updated on 08.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip10.10.2003Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 26.11.2003  [2003/48]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NIAGARA MOHAWK POWER CORPORATION
300 Erie Boulevard West Syracuse
New York 13202 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/19]For all designated states
NIAGARA MOHAWK POWER CORPORATION
300 Erie Boulevard West
Syracuse New York 13202 / US
Inventor(s)01 / BLOOMFIELD, David P.
Unite 301, 160 Commonwealth Avenue
Boston, MA 02116 / US
[2000/19]
Representative(s)Vuillermoz, Bruno
Cabinet Laurent & Charras
"Le Contemporain"
50, Chemin de la Bruyère
69574 Dardilly Cédex / FR
[N/P]
Former [2000/19]Vuillermoz, Bruno
Cabinet Laurent & Charras B.P. 32 20, rue Louis Chirpaz
69131 Ecully Cédex / FR
Application number, filing date98934386.809.07.1998
[2000/19]
WO1998US14300
Priority number, dateUS1997089314415.07.1997         Original published format: US 893144
[2000/19]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9903952
Date:28.01.1999
Language:EN
[1999/04]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0998543
Date:10.05.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.01.1999
[2000/19]
Search report(s)International search reportUS28.01.1999
ClassificationInternational:C10K3/00
[2000/19]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2000/19]
TitleGerman:ELEKTROCHEMISCHER WASSERSTOFFKOMPRESSOR MIT ELEKTROCHEMISCHEM AUTOTHERMEN REFORMER[2000/19]
English:ELECTROCHEMICAL HYDROGEN COMPRESSOR WITH ELECTROCHEMICAL AUTOTHERMAL REFORMER[2000/19]
French:COMPRESSEUR ELECTROCHIMIQUE A HYDROGENE AVEC DISPOSITIF DE REFORMAGE AUTOTHERMIQUE ET ELECTROCHIMIQUE[2000/19]
Entry into regional phase03.01.2000National basic fee paid 
03.01.2000Search fee paid 
03.01.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
03.01.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure19.01.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
03.01.2000Examination requested  [2000/19]
29.09.2003Application withdrawn by applicant  [2003/48]
Fees paidRenewal fee
03.01.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
15.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
22.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
14.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
Cited inInternational search[A]US4885514  (NOVIS ARI M [US], et al);
 [A]US3489670  (MAGET HENRI J R)