Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0994698

EP0994698 - DELIVERY OF HYPERICUM PERFORATUM (ST. JOHN'S WORT) IN TABLET FORM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  28.02.2003
Database last updated on 22.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip29.08.2008Change - representativepublished on 01.10.2008  [2008/40]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
UPSHER-SMITH LABORATORIES, INC.
14905 23rd Avenue North Minneapolis
Minnesota 55447-4709 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/17]For all designated states
UPSHER-SMITH LABORATORIES, INC.
14905 23rd Avenue North
Minneapolis, Minnesota 55447-4709 / US
Inventor(s)01 / TOUREK, William, J.
705 Alvarado Lane North
Plymouth, MN 55447 / US
02 / DAISY, Samuel, Jr.
3807 Red Fox Drive
Cincinatti, OH 45245-2755 / US
[2000/37]
Former [2000/17]01 / TOUREK, William, J.
705 Alvarado Lane North
Plymouth, MN 55447 / US
02 / DAISY, Samuel, Jr.
1708 Lyn Park Avenue North
Minneapolis, MN 55411 / US
Representative(s)Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis , et al
Beresford Crump LLP
16 High Holborn
London WC1V 6BX / GB
[N/P]
Former [2008/40]Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis , et al
BERESFORD & Co. 16 High Holborn London
WC1V 6BX / GB
Former [2000/17]Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis , et al
2-5 Warwick Court High Holborn
London WC1R 5DJ / GB
Application number, filing date98934411.410.07.1998
[2000/17]
WO1998US14352
Priority number, dateUS1997089070511.07.1997         Original published format: US 890705
[2000/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9902138
Date:21.01.1999
Language:EN
[1999/03]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0994698
Date:26.04.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.01.1999
[2000/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP21.01.1999
ClassificationInternational:A61K9/20, A61K9/36, A61K35/78
[2000/17]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/17]
TitleGerman:VERABREICHUNG VON HYPERICUM PERFORATUM (JOHANNISKRAUT) IN TABLETTENFORM[2000/17]
English:DELIVERY OF HYPERICUM PERFORATUM (ST. JOHN'S WORT) IN TABLET FORM[2000/17]
French:ADMINISTRATION D'HYPERICUM PERFORATUM (LE MILLEPERTUIS) SOUS FORME DE TABLETTES[2000/17]
Entry into regional phase08.02.2000National basic fee paid 
08.02.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
08.02.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure09.02.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
08.02.2000Examination requested  [2000/17]
21.03.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
01.10.2002Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2003/16]
05.11.2002Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2003/16]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
25.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
22.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[XY]EP0256454  (DAINICHISEIKA COLOR CHEM [JP]) [X] 1-11 * page 6, lines 25-40; claims 1-4 * [Y] 1-11;
 [Y]WO8909056  (UNIV NEW YORK [US]) [Y] 1-11 * claims 10,12-17 *;
 [Y]WO9713489  (SCHWABE WILLMAR GMBH & CO [DE], et al) [Y] 1-11 * page 5, lines 11-13 * * page 9; example 8 * * claim 1 *;
 [Y]WO9722354  (DRELUSO PHARM DR ELTEN & SOHN [DE], et al) [Y] 1-11 * page 6, lines 12-17; claims 1-4,7 *;
 [Y]EP0702957  (KREWEL WERKE GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1-11 * column 2, lines 36-51; claims 1-4,7 * * column 3, lines 1-8 *;
 [PX]EP0847756  (LAVIE DAVID [IL], et al) [PX] 1-11 * claims 17,20-24 *