Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1097436

EP1097436 - INTERACTIVE PROCESS FOR APPLYING OR PRINTING INFORMATION ON LETTERS OR PARCELS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  19.03.2004
Database last updated on 22.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip06.06.2008Change - representativepublished on 09.07.2008  [2008/28]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Reiter, Joshua J.
500 West University Parkway, 12-T
Baltimore, MD 21210 / US
[2001/19]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2001/19]
Representative(s)Viering, Hans-Martin
Viering, Jentschura & Partner
ATTENTION : ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/28]Viering, Hans-Martin
Viering, Jentschura & Partner Postfach 22 14 43
80504 München / DE
Former [2001/19]Viering, Hans-Martin, Dipl.-Ing.
Patentanwälte Viering, Jentschura & Partner, Postfach 22 14 43
80504 München / DE
Application number, filing date98934428.810.07.1998
[2001/19]
WO1998US14382
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0003359
Date:20.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/03]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1097436
Date:09.05.2001
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.01.2000
[2001/19]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1097436
Date:14.05.2003
Language:EN
[2003/20]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US20.01.2000
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.04.2001
ClassificationInternational:G07B17/00, G06F17/30
[2001/19]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2001/19]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUM INTERAKTIVEN ANBRINGEN ODER DRUCKEN VON INFORMATIONEN AUF BRIEFEN ODER PAKETEN[2001/19]
English:INTERACTIVE PROCESS FOR APPLYING OR PRINTING INFORMATION ON LETTERS OR PARCELS[2001/19]
French:PROCEDE INTERACTIF POUR L'APPLICATION OU L'IMPRESSION D'INFORMATIONS SUR DES LETTRES OU DES COLIS[2001/19]
Entry into regional phase09.02.2001National basic fee paid 
09.02.2001Search fee paid 
09.02.2001Designation fee(s) paid 
09.02.2001Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure24.01.2000Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
10.01.2001Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
09.02.2001Examination requested  [2001/19]
16.02.2001Request for accelerated examination filed
17.10.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.10.2001Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes
19.02.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.03.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.05.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.07.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.09.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.11.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.03.2003Fee for grant paid
14.03.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)17.02.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/19]
Fees paidRenewal fee
09.02.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
31.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
31.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0604148  (NEOPOST LTD [GB]) [X] 10-20 * figure 2; claim 1 *
International search[A]US4149711  (JACKSON DALE H);
 [A]US4511793  (RACANELLI SYLVESTER [US]);
 [A]US4752675  (ZETMEIR KARL D [US]);
 [A]US4831554  (STORACE ANTHONY [US], et al);
 [A]US5039075  (MAYER THEODORE W [US]);
 [A]US5143362  (DOANE I GERALD [US], et al);
 [A]US5177687  (BAGGARLY BRAD A [US], et al);
 [A]US5446919  (WILKINS JEFF K [US]);
 [A]US5471925  (HEINRICH KLAUS [DE], et al);
 [A]US5490077  (FREYTAG CLAUS [DE]);
 [A]US5602743  (FREYTAG CLAUS [DE]);
 [A]US5640835  (MUSCOPLAT RICHARD [US]);
 [AE]US5819241  (REITER JOSHUA J [US])