Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0995168

EP0995168 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR AUTOMATICALLY VERIFYING IDENTITY OF A SUBJECT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  24.06.2005
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip25.07.2008Change - representativepublished on 27.08.2008  [2008/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Bes Systems Inc.
22 West 38 Street, Suite 600
New York, NY 10018 / US
[2000/28]
Former [2000/17]For all designated states
Bes Systems Inc.
Suite 220A, 200 Perrine Road
Old Bridge, NJ 08857 / US
Inventor(s)01 / SHPUNTOV, Mikhail
437 Madison Gardens
Old Bridge, NJ 08857 / US
02 / PLETNEV, Alexandre
Apartment 14, 9 Chistoprudnty Boulevard
Moscow, 10100 / RU
03 / BERESTETSKIY, Mikhail
3060 Ocean Avenue, Apt. 5G
Brooklyn, NY 11235 / US
[2000/28]
Former [2000/17]01 / SHPUNTOV, Mikhail
3 Lindsey Circle
Old Bridge, NJ 08857 / US
02 / PLETNEV, Alexandre
Apartment 14, 9 Chistoprudnty Boulevard
Moscow, 10100 / RU
03 / BERESTETSKIY, Mikhail
1st floor, 2424 East 22nd Street
Brooklyn, NY 11235 / US
Representative(s)Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/35]Vossius & Partner
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
Former [2000/17]VOSSIUS & PARTNER
Siebertstrasse 4
81675 München / DE
Application number, filing date98934478.313.07.1998
[2000/17]
WO1998US14465
Priority number, dateUS1997089195814.07.1997         Original published format: US 891958
[2000/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9904360
Date:28.01.1999
Language:EN
[1999/04]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0995168
Date:26.04.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.01.1999
[2000/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US28.01.1999
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP16.10.2001
ClassificationInternational:G06K9/00
[2000/17]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/17]
TitleGerman:SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUM AUTOMATISCHEN VERIFIIEREN EINES SUBJEKTES[2000/17]
English:SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR AUTOMATICALLY VERIFYING IDENTITY OF A SUBJECT[2000/17]
French:SYSTEME ET PROCEDE DE VERIFICATION AUTOMATIQUE DE L'IDENTITE D'UN INDIVIDU[2000/17]
Entry into regional phase24.01.2000National basic fee paid 
24.01.2000Search fee paid 
24.01.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
24.01.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure11.02.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
24.01.2000Examination requested  [2000/17]
01.02.2005Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2005/32]
10.03.2005Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2005/32]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.07.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
31.01.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
31.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
02.02.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.200104   M06   Fee paid on   31.01.2002
31.07.200306   M06   Fee paid on   02.02.2004
31.07.200407   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[A]  HIRONORI YAHAGI ET AL, "MOVING-WINDOW ALGORITHM FOR FAST FINGERPRINT VERIFICATION", TECHNOLOGIES TODAY AND TOMORROW. NEW ORLEANS, APRIL 1 - 4, 1990, PROCEEDINGS OF THE SOUTHEAST CONFERENCE (SOUTHEASTCON), NEW YORK, IEEE, US, (19900401), vol. 1, pages 343 - 347, XP000203123 [A] 1-17 * Section "3. Moving-Window Algorithm";; figures 1,2 *
International search[A]US4581760  (SCHILLER MICHAEL [US], et al);
 [A]US5261008  (YAMAMOTO MAKOTO [JP]);
 [A]US4641350  (BUNN ROBERT F [US])