Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1094846

EP1094846 - DISINFECTANT DYE REMOVAL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  20.02.2004
Database last updated on 13.08.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip26.11.2004Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MC
published on 12.01.2005  [2005/02]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Shanbrom Technologies, LLC
Suite B, 603 West Ojai Avenue
Ojai, CA 93023-3732 / US
[2001/18]
Inventor(s)01 / SHANBROM, Edward
2252 Liane Lane
Santa Ana, CA 92705 / US
 [2001/18]
Representative(s)Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastrasse 30
81925 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2001/18]HOFFMANN - EITLE
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
Application number, filing date98934629.116.07.1998
[2001/18]
WO1998US14863
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0003751
Date:27.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/04]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1094846
Date:02.05.2001
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.01.2000
[2001/18]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1094846
Date:16.04.2003
Language:EN
[2003/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP27.01.2000
ClassificationInternational:A61L2/18, A61L2/02
[2001/18]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/18]
TitleGerman:ENTFERNUNG VON DESINFEKTIONSFARBEN[2002/43]
English:DISINFECTANT DYE REMOVAL[2001/18]
French:ELIMINATION DE COLORANTS DESINFECTANTS[2001/18]
Former [2001/18]DESINFEKTIONSENTFERNUNG VON FARBEN
Entry into regional phase15.02.2001National basic fee paid 
15.02.2001Designation fee(s) paid 
15.02.2001Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure15.02.2000Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
15.02.2001Examination requested  [2001/18]
16.04.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.08.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.10.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.02.2003Fee for grant paid
07.02.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)19.01.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/15]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
18.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
25.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.01.200103   M06   Fee paid on   25.05.2001
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFI16.04.2003
CY16.07.2003
GR16.07.2003
LU16.07.2003
MC31.07.2003
[2005/02]
Former [2004/39]FI16.04.2003
CY16.07.2003
GR16.07.2003
LU16.07.2003
Former [2004/36]FI16.04.2003
CY16.07.2003
GR16.07.2003
Former [2004/05]FI16.04.2003
GR16.07.2003
Former [2004/02]GR16.07.2003
Cited inInternational search[Y]US5639376  (LEE ERIC KIN-LAM [US], et al) [Y] 1-14 * example -; claim - *;
 [Y]WO9516348  (BAXTER INT [US]) [Y] 1-14 * example 1; claim - *;
 [A]WO9822151  (SHANBROM EDWARD [US]);
 [A]WO9500631  (NEW YORK BLOOD CENTER INC [US]);
 [E]US5858641  (SHANBROM EDWARD [US]) [E] 1-14 * the whole document *