Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0996379

EP0996379 - EXPANDABLE CATHETER HAVING IMPROVED ELECTRODE DESIGN [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2000/18]EXPANDABLE CATHETER HAVING IMPROVED ELECTRODE DESIGN, AND METHOD FOR APPLYING ENERGY
[2003/38]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  01.04.2005
Database last updated on 20.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip01.04.2005No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 18.05.2005  [2005/20]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
VNUS MEDICAL TECHNOLOGIES, INC.
2200 Zanker Road, Suite F
San Jose, CA 95131 / US
[N/P]
Former [2004/47]For all designated states
VNUS Medical Technologies, Inc.
2200 Zanker Road, Suite F
San Jose, CA 95131 / US
Former [2000/18]For all designated states
VNUS MEDICAL TECHNOLOGIES, INC.
238 E. Caribbean Drive
Sunnyvale, CA 94086 / US
Inventor(s)01 / FARLEY, Brian, E.
1534 Kathy Lane
Los Altos, CA 94024 / US
02 / SCHULZ, Grace, Y.
267 Kelton Avenue
San Carlos, CA 94070 / US
03 / HENDERSON, Dawn, A.
572 Cuesta Drive
Los Altos, CA 94024 / US
04 / PARKER, Mark, P.
5569 Dent Avenue
San Jose, CA 95118 / US
05 / MILLER, Gary, H.
529 Bryce Court
Milpitas, CA 95035 / US
06 / DAULTON, Jay, S.
2359 Meadowmont Drive
San Jose, CA 95133 / US
07 / PORTNOW, Douglas
1063 Morse Avenue 22-303
Sunnyvale, CA 94088 / US
08 / ZIKORUS, Arthur W.
1547 Thombriar Drive
San Jose, CA 95131 / US
[2000/35]
Former [2000/20]01 / FARLEY, Brian, E.
1534 Kathy Lane
Los Altos, CA 94024 / US
02 / SCHULZ, Grace, Y.
267 Kelton Avenue
San Carlos, CA 94070 / US
03 / HENDERSON, Dawn, A.
2935 Alexis Drive
Palo Alto, CA 94304 / US
04 / PARKER, Mark, P.
5569 Dent Avenue
San Jose, CA 95118 / US
05 / MILLER, Gary, H.
529 Bryce Court
Milpitas, CA 95035 / US
06 / DAULTON, Jay, S.
2359 Meadowmont Drive
San Jose, CA 95133 / US
07 / PORTNOW, Douglas
1063 Morse Avenue 22-303
Sunnyvale, CA 94088 / US
08 / ZIKORUS, Arthur W.
1547 Thombriar Drive
San Jose, CA 95131 / US
Former [2000/18]01 / FARLEY, Brian, E.
1534 Kathy Lane
Los Altos, CA 94024 / US
02 / SCHULZ, Grace, Y.
267 Kelton Avenue
San Carlos, CA 94070 / US
03 / HENDERSON, Dawn, A.
2935 Alexis Drive
Palo Alto, CA 94304 / US
04 / PARKER, Mark, P.
5569 Dent Avenue
San Jose, CA 95118 / US
05 / MILLER, Gary, H.
529 Bryce Court
Milpitas, CA 95035 / US
06 / DAULTON, Jay, S.
2359 Meadowmont Drive
San Jose, CA 95133 / US
07 / PORTNOW, Douglas
1063 Morse Avenue 22-303
Sunnyvale, CA 94088 / US
Representative(s)Howden, Christopher A. , et al
FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22
80336 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/18]Howden, Christopher Andrew , et al
FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Franz-Joseph-Strasse 38
80801 München / DE
Application number, filing date98934642.417.07.1998
[2000/18]
WO1998US14912
Priority number, dateUS1997089585017.07.1997         Original published format: US 895850
[2000/18]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9903413
Date:28.01.1999
Language:EN
[1999/04]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0996379
Date:03.05.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.01.1999
[2000/18]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0996379
Date:26.05.2004
Language:EN
[2004/22]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP28.01.1999
ClassificationInternational:A61B18/12
[2003/38]
Former International [2000/18]A61B17/39
Designated contracting statesAT,   CH,   DE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/18]
TitleGerman:EXPANDIERBARER KATHETER MIT VERBESSERTEN ELEKTRODENAUFBAU[2003/38]
English:EXPANDABLE CATHETER HAVING IMPROVED ELECTRODE DESIGN[2003/38]
French:CATHETER EXTENSIBLE PRESENTANT UN MOTIF D'ELECTRODES AMELIORE[2003/38]
Former [2000/18]EXPANDIERBARER KATHETER MIT VERBESSERTEN ELEKTRODENAUFBAU UND VERFAHREN FÜR DIE ENERGIEZUFUHR
Former [2000/18]EXPANDABLE CATHETER HAVING IMPROVED ELECTRODE DESIGN, AND METHOD FOR APPLYING ENERGY
Former [2000/18]CATHETER EXTENSIBLE PRESENTANT UN MOTIF D'ELECTRODES AMELIORE, ET PROCEDE D'APPLICATION D'ENERGIE
Entry into regional phase21.01.2000National basic fee paid 
21.01.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
21.01.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure09.02.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
21.01.2000Examination requested  [2000/18]
02.01.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
10.07.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.08.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.02.2004Fee for grant paid
23.02.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP04004523.9  / EP1421912
EP07005165.1  / EP1790305
Opposition(s)01.03.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/20]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.09.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
25.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
22.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
23.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.200003   M06   Fee paid on   22.09.2000
Cited inInternational search[XA]EP0472368  (MED INST INC [US]) [X] 1-3,5-8,17,18,21 * column 1, line 47 - column 2, line 21 * * column 3, line 5 - line 13 * * column 5, line 2 - line 23 * * figures 1-4,9 * [A] 19,34,61;
 [X]US4709698  (JOHNSTON JAMES H [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5-10 * column 1, line 11 - line 18 * * column 2, line 49 - column 3, line 55 * * figures 1-5 *;
 [X]WO9502370  (SALIM AWS SHAKIR MUSTAFA [GB]) [X] 1 * page 6, line 5 - line 26 * * figure 1 *;
 [X]US4976711  (PARINS DAVID J [US], et al) [X] 1-3,6,7 * column 4, line 39 - line 63 *;
 [A]WO9531142  (APPLIED MED RESOURCES [US]) [A] 1,34,61 * page 20, line 29 - page 21 *
Examination US5499981
  US5117828