Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0996957

EP0996957 - CAPACITOR CONNECTOR, ESPECIALLY FOR AN ELECTROLYTIC POWER CAPACITOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  11.07.2003
Database last updated on 19.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip11.07.2003No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 27.08.2003  [2003/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ROBERT BOSCH GMBH
Postfach 30 02 20
70442 Stuttgart / DE
[2000/18]
Inventor(s)01 / LANDSGESELL, Jürgen
Beutingerstrasse 7
D-74076 Heilbronn / DE
[2000/18]
Application number, filing date98934827.129.05.1998
[2000/18]
WO1998DE01471
Priority number, dateDE199712291031.05.1997         Original published format: DE 19722910
[2000/18]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9854738
Date:03.12.1998
Language:DE
[1998/48]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0996957
Date:03.05.2000
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.12.1998
[2000/18]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0996957
Date:04.09.2002
Language:DE
[2002/36]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP03.12.1998
ClassificationInternational:H01G2/04, H05K3/32
[2000/18]
Designated contracting statesAT,   CH,   DE,   FR,   IT,   LI [2000/18]
TitleGerman:KONDENSATORANSCHLUSS, INSBESONDERE FÜR EINEN ELEKTROLYT-LEISTUNGSKONDENSATOR[2000/18]
English:CAPACITOR CONNECTOR, ESPECIALLY FOR AN ELECTROLYTIC POWER CAPACITOR[2000/18]
French:CONNEXION DE CONDENSATEUR, NOTAMMENT POUR CONDENSATEUR DE PUISSANCE ELECTROLYTIQUE[2000/18]
Entry into regional phase05.01.2000National basic fee paid 
05.01.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
05.01.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure15.12.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
05.01.2000Examination requested  [2000/18]
29.10.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
06.03.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.06.2002Fee for grant paid
17.06.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)05.06.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/35]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.05.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
31.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
31.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[A]EP0450122  (SIEMENS MATSUSHITA COMPONENTS [DE]) [A] 1,2,4,8,9 * column 1, line 34 - line 37 * * column 4, line 44 - line 49 * * figures 1,8 *;
 [A]DE1915780  (STANDARD ELEKTRIK LORENZ AG) [A] 1,2,4,5,7 * page 1, line 15 - line 20 * * page 3, line 1 - line 23 * * figures 1,2 *;
 [A]DE4439272  (SIEMENS MATSUSHITA COMPONENTS [DE]) [A] 1-5 * claim 1 * * figures 1,2 *