Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0991733

EP0991733 - MIXTURE OF SUBSTANCES CONTAINING COMPOUNDS WITH VINYL GROUPS AND STABILIZERS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  28.06.2003
Database last updated on 22.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip27.06.2008Change - applicantpublished on 30.07.2008  [2008/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BASF Aktiengesellschaft
Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38
67063 Ludwigshafen / DE
[2008/31]
Former [2000/15]For all designated states
BASF AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
67056 Ludwigshafen / DE
Inventor(s)01 / SUTORIS, Heinz, Friedrich
Zellerstrasse 9b
D-67227 Frankenthal / DE
02 / MITULLA, Konrad
Zum Gutshof 26
D-67071 Ludwigshafen / DE
03 / DUPUIS, Jacques
Bruderweg 9
D-67069 Ludwigshafen / DE
04 / KALIBA, Claus
Rehbachstrasse 40
D-67141 Neuhofen / DE
[2000/15]
Application number, filing date98934913.904.06.1998
[2000/15]
WO1998EP03338
Priority number, dateDE199712551917.06.1997         Original published format: DE 19725519
[2000/15]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9858038
Date:23.12.1998
Language:DE
[1998/51]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0991733
Date:12.04.2000
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.12.1998
[2000/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP23.12.1998
ClassificationInternational:C09K15/30, C07C7/20, C07B63/04
[2000/15]
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [2000/15]
Extension statesRO17.11.1999
TitleGerman:STOFFMISCHUNG, ENTHALTEND VINYLGRUPPENHALTIGE VERBINDUNGEN UND STABILISATOREN[2000/15]
English:MIXTURE OF SUBSTANCES CONTAINING COMPOUNDS WITH VINYL GROUPS AND STABILIZERS[2000/15]
French:MELANGE DE SUBSTANCES CONTENANT DES STABILISANTS ET DES COMPOSES RENFERMANT DES GROUPES VINYLIQUES[2000/15]
Entry into regional phase17.11.1999National basic fee paid 
17.11.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
17.11.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure09.11.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
17.11.1999Examination requested  [2000/15]
14.06.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
20.12.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.04.2003Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
18.06.2003Application withdrawn by applicant  [2003/33]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
28.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
15.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
19.05.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
Cited inInternational search[A]EP0301879  (HOECHST CELANESE CORP [US]) [A] 1-10 * column 2, line 35 - column 5, line 18 *;
 [A]EP0467848  (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]) [A] 1-10 * examples 3,7 *;
 [PA]DE19638868  (BASF AG [DE]) [PA] 1-10 * page 9, line 33 - line 38 *;
 [DA]WO9616921  (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]) [DA] 1-10 * the whole document *;
 [DPA]WO9746504  (BASF AG [DE], et al) [DPA] 1-10 * the whole document *