Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1024726

EP1024726 - EPILATION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  12.12.2008
Database last updated on 18.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip01.01.2010Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 03.02.2010  [2010/05]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Braun GmbH
Frankfurter Strasse 145
61476 Kronberg / DE
[2000/32]
Inventor(s)01 / KNESCH, Holger
Westfalenstrasse 6
D-71640 Ludwigsburg / DE
02 / SANCHEZ-MARTINEZ, Pedro
Oberurseler Strasse 59
D-61476 Kronberg / DE
[2000/32]
Representative(s)Vorbeck, Wolfgang
Braun GmbH Frankfurter Strasse 145, Postfach 1120
61466 Kronberg / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/32]Vorbeck, Wolfgang Ernst August, Dr.
Braun GmbH Frankfurter Strasse 145, Postfach 1120
61466 Kronberg / DE
Application number, filing date98934978.218.06.1998
[2000/32]
WO1998EP03729
Priority number, dateDE199714587717.10.1997         Original published format: DE 19745877
DE199810299628.01.1998         Original published format: DE 19802996
[2000/32]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9920147
Date:29.04.1999
Language:DE
[1999/17]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1024726
Date:09.08.2000
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.04.1999
[2000/32]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1024726
Date:25.09.2002
Language:DE
[2002/39]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP29.04.1999
ClassificationInternational:A45D26/00
[2000/32]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/32]
TitleGerman:EPILATIONSGERÄT[2000/32]
English:EPILATION DEVICE[2000/32]
French:APPAREIL D'EPILATION[2000/32]
Entry into regional phase26.02.2000National basic fee paid 
26.02.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
26.02.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure16.11.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
26.02.2000Examination requested  [2000/32]
27.09.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.12.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.03.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
15.04.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.06.2002Fee for grant paid
15.06.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  20.06.2003  01.08.2003  ADMISSIBLE
Matsushita Electric Works, Ltd.
1048, Oaza-Kadoma, Kadoma-shi
Osaka 571, Japan / JP
Opponent's representative
Appelt, Christian W.
Boehmert & Boehmert
Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB
Pettenkoferstrasse 22
80336 München / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2008/44]
Opponent(s)01  20.06.2003  01.08.2003  ADMISSIBLE
Matsushita Electric Works, Ltd.
1048, Oaza-Kadoma, Kadoma-shi
Osaka 571, Japan / JP
Opponent's representative
Appelt, Christian W.
Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22
80336 München / DE
Former [2003/41]
Opponent(s)01  20.06.2003  01.08.2003  ADMISSIBLE
Matsushita Electric Works, Ltd.
1048, Oaza-Kadoma, Kadoma-shi
Osaka 571, Japan / JP
Opponent's representative
Appelt, Christian W.
Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22
80336 München / DE
Former [2003/33]
Opponent(s)01  20.06.2003  01.08.2003  ADMISSIBLE
Matsushita Electric Works, Ltd.
1048, Oaza-Kadoma, Kadoma-shi
Osaka 571, Japan / JP
Opponent's representative
Appelt, Christian W.
Boehmert & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22
80336 München / DE
06.08.2003Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
06.02.2004Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
19.11.2004Date of oral proceedings
08.12.2004Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
19.10.2007Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04)
19.10.2007Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M06)
28.11.2007Reply to a communication from the opposition division
15.04.2008Reply to a communication from the opposition division
13.06.2008Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
23.06.2008Legal effect of revocation of patent [2009/03]
Appeal following opposition23.12.2004Appeal received No.  T1448/04
13.04.2005Statement of grounds filed
10.07.2007Result of appeal procedure: continuation of opposition procedure
10.07.2007Date of oral proceedings
23.07.2007Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.05.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
01.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
06.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFI25.09.2002
GB25.09.2002
GR25.09.2002
IE25.09.2002
DK25.12.2002
SE25.12.2002
PT26.12.2002
BE30.06.2003
CH30.06.2005
LI30.06.2005
NL01.01.2006
IT18.06.2008
[2010/05]
Former [2007/18]FI25.09.2002
GB25.09.2002
GR25.09.2002
IE25.09.2002
DK25.12.2002
SE25.12.2002
PT26.12.2002
BE30.06.2003
CH30.06.2005
LI30.06.2005
NL01.01.2006
Former [2006/33]FI25.09.2002
GB25.09.2002
GR25.09.2002
IE25.09.2002
SE25.12.2002
PT26.12.2002
CH30.06.2005
LI30.06.2005
NL01.01.2006
Former [2006/22]FI25.09.2002
GB25.09.2002
GR25.09.2002
IE25.09.2002
SE25.12.2002
PT26.12.2002
NL01.01.2006
Former [2004/21]FI25.09.2002
GB25.09.2002
GR25.09.2002
IE25.09.2002
SE25.12.2002
PT26.12.2002
Former [2003/42]FI25.09.2002
GR25.09.2002
IE25.09.2002
SE25.12.2002
PT26.12.2002
Former [2003/29]FI25.09.2002
GR25.09.2002
SE25.12.2002
PT26.12.2002
Former [2003/20]FI25.09.2002
GR25.09.2002
SE25.12.2002
Former [2003/14]FI25.09.2002
SE25.12.2002
Cited inInternational search[DA]FR2668902  (SEB SA [FR]) [DA] 1,2,8-10,15,17-20,22,25,28,31-33 * page 11, line 31 - page 12, line 14; figure 7 *;
 [A]EP0622033  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS LTD [JP]) [A] 1-3,6,11,21-30 * page 7, line 13 - line 56; figures 2-6,14-18 *;
 [A]EP0547390  (BRAUN AG [DE]) [A] 8,9,15,19,32 * column 12, line 2 - column 14, line 25; figures 5,9-17 *;
 [A]EP0569614  (BRAUN AG [DE]) [A] 19 * column 7, line 51 - column 8, line 5; figures 2,4 *
by applicantFR2668902