Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0995312

EP0995312 - METHOD AND TERMINAL FOR PROVIDING SERVICES IN TELECOMMUNICATION NETWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  20.02.2009
Database last updated on 17.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip20.05.2011Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): GR
published on 22.06.2011  [2011/25]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Domiras Oy
Eteläesplanadi 14
00130 Helsinki / FI
[2000/17]
Inventor(s)01 / MÄKIPÄÄ, Risto
Ylätie 11
FIN-50670 Otava / FI
[2000/17]
Representative(s)Kaukonen, Juha Veikko , et al
Kolster Oy Ab
Iso Roobertinkatu 23
P.O. Box 148
00121 Helsinki / FI
[N/P]
Former [2000/17]Kaukonen, Juha Veikko , et al
Kolster Oy Ab, Iso Roobertinkatu 23, P.O. Box 148
00121 Helsinki / FI
Application number, filing date98935057.415.07.1998
[2000/17]
WO1998FI00598
Priority number, dateFI1997000303317.07.1997         Original published format: FI 973033
[2000/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO9907152
Date:11.02.1999
Language:EN
[1999/06]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0995312
Date:26.04.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.02.1999
[2000/17]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0995312
Date:16.04.2008
Language:EN
[2008/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:SE08.04.1999
ClassificationInternational:H04N7/173
[2000/17]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/17]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND TERMINAL ZUM ANBIETEN VON DIENSTEN IN EINEM TELEKOMMUNIKATIONSNETZWERK ANZUBIETEN[2000/17]
English:METHOD AND TERMINAL FOR PROVIDING SERVICES IN TELECOMMUNICATION NETWORK[2000/17]
French:PROCEDE ET TERMINAL PERMETTANT D'OFFRIR DES SERVICES DANS UN RESEAU DE TELECOMMUNICATIONS[2000/17]
Entry into regional phase06.01.2000National basic fee paid 
06.01.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
06.01.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure15.02.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE
06.01.2000Examination requested  [2000/17]
05.07.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.11.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.04.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
05.10.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.09.2007Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 11.10.2007
26.09.2007Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
11.10.2007Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
26.10.2007Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.02.2008Fee for grant paid
26.02.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)19.01.2009No opposition filed within time limit [2009/13]
Fees paidRenewal fee
06.01.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
23.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
19.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
16.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
22.07.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
18.07.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
24.07.2006Renewal fee patent year 09
20.07.2007Renewal fee patent year 10
Lapses during opposition  TooltipBE16.04.2008
CY16.04.2008
FI16.04.2008
LU15.07.2008
GR17.07.2008
MC31.07.2008
[2011/25]
Former [2010/28]BE16.04.2008
CY16.04.2008
FI16.04.2008
LU15.07.2008
MC31.07.2008
Former [2010/05]BE16.04.2008
CY16.04.2008
FI16.04.2008
MC31.07.2008
Former [2009/18]BE16.04.2008
FI16.04.2008
MC31.07.2008
Former [2009/14]BE16.04.2008
FI16.04.2008
Former [2008/49]FI16.04.2008
Cited inInternational search[X]EP0756423  (TOSHIBA KK [JP]);
 [X]EP0752787  (TELIA AB [SE]);
 [X]US5630119  (ARISTIDES PHIVOS C [US], et al);
 [A]WO9515658  (DISCOVERY COMMUNICAT INC [US]);
 [A]WO9634486  (TV GUIDE ON SCREEN [US])