Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0991426

EP0991426 - METHOD FOR TRANSFERRING NUCLEIC ACID INTO THE STRIATED MUSCLE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2000/15]IMPROVED METHOD FOR TRANSFERRING NUCLEIC ACID INTO THE STRIPED MUSCLE AND COMBINATION THEREFOR
[2003/06]
StatusPatent maintained as amended
Status updated on  23.02.2007
Database last updated on 19.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip06.06.2008Change - opposition data/opponents data or that of the opponents representativepublished on 09.07.2008  [2008/28]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Institut Gustave Roussy
39, rue Camille Desmoulins
94805 Villejuif Cédex / FR
For all designated states
CENTRE NATIONAL DE LA RECHERCHE SCIENTIFIQUE -CNRS-
3, rue Michel-Ange
75016 Paris / FR
[N/P]
Former [2007/13]For all designated states
Institut Gustave Roussy
39, rue Camille Desmoulins
94805 Villejuif Cédex / FR
For all designated states
CENTRE NATIONAL DE LA RECHERCHE SCIENTIFIQUE (CNRS)
3, rue Michel Ange
75016 Paris / FR
Former [2004/48]For all designated states
INSTITUT GUSTAVE ROUSSY
39, rue Camille Desmoulins
94805 Villejuif Cédex / FR
For all designated states
CENTRE NATIONAL DE LA RECHERCHE SCIENTIFIQUE (CNRS)
3, rue Michel Ange
75016 Paris / FR
Former [2004/37]For all designated states
Aventis Pharma S.A.
20, avenue Raymond Aron
92160 Antony / FR
For all designated states
INSTITUT GUSTAVE ROUSSY
39, rue Camille Desmoulins
94805 Villejuif Cédex / FR
For all designated states
CENTRE NATIONAL DE LA RECHERCHE SCIENTIFIQUE (CNRS)
3, rue Michel Ange
75016 Paris / FR
Former [2000/15]For all designated states
RHONE-POULENC RORER S.A.
20, avenue Raymond Aron
92160 Antony / FR
For all designated states
INSTITUT GUSTAVE ROUSSY
39, rue Camille Desmoulins
F-94805 Villejuif Cédex / FR
For all designated states
CENTRE NATIONAL DE LA RECHERCHE SCIENTIFIQUE (CNRS)
3, rue Michel Ange
75016 Paris / FR
Inventor(s)01 / BUREAU, Michel
1, square Sainte Clothilde
F-92210 Saint Cloud / FR
02 / MIT, Lluis
22, allée des Vaupépins
F-91370 Verrières le Buisson / FR
03 / SCHERMAN, Daniel
10, rue Erard
F-75012 Paris / FR
[2000/15]
Representative(s)Warcoin, Jacques , et al
Cabinet Regimbeau
20, rue de Chazelles
75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR
[N/P]
Former [2003/25]Warcoin, Jacques , et al
Cabinet Régimbeau 20, rue de Chazelles
75847 Paris cedex 17 / FR
Former [2000/15]Bouvet, Philippe , et al
Rhône-Poulenc Rorer S.A. 20, Avenue Raymond Aron
92160 Antony / FR
Application number, filing date98935067.330.06.1998
[2000/15]
WO1998FR01400
Priority number, dateFR1997000823330.06.1997         Original published format: FR 9708233
US19970067488P01.12.1997         Original published format: US 67488 P
[2000/15]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9901158
Date:14.01.1999
Language:FR
[1999/02]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0991426
Date:12.04.2000
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.01.1999
[2000/15]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0991426
Date:08.09.2004
Language:FR
[2004/37]
Type: B2 New European patent specification 
No.:EP0991426
Date:28.03.2007
Language:FR
[2007/13]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP14.01.1999
ClassificationInternational:A61K48/00
[2000/15]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/15]
Extension statesSI27.12.1999
TitleGerman:VERABREICHUNG DER NUKLEINSÄURE IN DEN QUERGESTREIFTEN MUSKEL[2003/06]
English:METHOD FOR TRANSFERRING NUCLEIC ACID INTO THE STRIATED MUSCLE[2003/06]
French:PROCEDE DE TRANSFERT D'ACIDE NUCLEIQUE DANS LE MUSCLE STRIE[2003/06]
Former [2000/15]VERBESSERUNG DER VERABREICHUNG DER NUKLEINSÄURE IN DEN QUERGESTREIFTEN MUSKEL UND KOMBINATION ZUR DURCHFÜHRUNG DES VERFAHRENS
Former [2000/15]IMPROVED METHOD FOR TRANSFERRING NUCLEIC ACID INTO THE STRIPED MUSCLE AND COMBINATION THEREFOR
Former [2000/15]AMELIORATION DU TRANSFERT D'ACIDE NUCLEIQUE DANS LE MUSCLE STRIE ET COMBINAISON PERMETTANT LA MISE EN OEUVRE DU PROCEDE
Entry into regional phase27.12.1999National basic fee paid 
27.12.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
27.12.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure07.01.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
27.12.1999Examination requested  [2000/15]
21.02.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
07.08.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.02.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
07.08.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.10.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.04.2004Fee for grant paid
20.04.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  08.06.2005  26.05.2006  WITHDRAWN
Genetronics, Inc.
11494 Sorrento Valley Road
San Diego, CA 92121 / US
Opponent's representative
Schlee, Alexander Richard, et al
Viering, Jentschura & Partner
ATTENTION : ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2008/28]
Opponent(s)01  08.06.2005  26.05.2006  WITHDRAWN
Genetronics, Inc.
11494 Sorrento Valley Road
San Diego, CA 92121 / US
Opponent's representative
Schlee, Alexander Richard, et al
Viering, Jentschura & Partner Postfach 22 14 43
80504 München / DE
Former [2006/27]
Opponent(s)01  08.06.2005  26.05.2006  WITHDRAWN
Genetronics, Inc.
11494 Sorrento Valley Road
San Diego, CA 92121 / US
Opponent's representative
Schlee, Alexander Richard, et al
Viering, Jentschura & Partner, Patentanwälte Steinsdorfstrasse 6
80538 München / DE
Former [2005/31]
Opponent(s)01  08.06.2005   
Genetronics, Inc.
11494 Sorrento Valley Road
San Diego, CA 92121 / US
Opponent's representative
Schlee, Alexander, Dipl.-Ing., et al
Viering, Jentschura & Partner, Patentanwälte Steinsdorfstrasse 6
80538 München / DE
16.06.2005No. 01: Notification indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition
08.07.2005No. 01: Reply to notification indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition
18.07.2005Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
26.01.2006Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
31.07.2006Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
10.08.2006Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
16.11.2006Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
29.01.2007Fee for printing new specification paid
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.05.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
23.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
01.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
23.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
18.06.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT08.09.2004
FI08.09.2004
IE08.09.2004
NL08.09.2004
DK08.12.2004
GR08.12.2004
SE08.12.2004
ES19.12.2004
PT08.02.2005
CY30.06.2005
LU30.06.2005
[2008/16]
Former [2007/21]AT08.09.2004
FI08.09.2004
IE08.09.2004
NL08.09.2004
DK08.12.2004
GR08.12.2004
SE08.12.2004
ES19.12.2004
CY30.06.2005
LU30.06.2005
Former [2007/18]AT08.09.2004
FI08.09.2004
IE08.09.2004
NL08.09.2004
DK08.12.2004
GR08.12.2004
SE08.12.2004
ES19.12.2004
LU30.06.2005
Former [2006/14]AT08.09.2004
FI08.09.2004
IE08.09.2004
NL08.09.2004
DK08.12.2004
GR08.12.2004
SE08.12.2004
ES19.12.2004
Former [2005/46]AT08.09.2004
FI08.09.2004
IE08.09.2004
DK08.12.2004
GR08.12.2004
SE08.12.2004
ES19.12.2004
Former [2005/27]AT08.09.2004
FI08.09.2004
IE08.09.2004
GR08.12.2004
SE08.12.2004
ES19.12.2004
Former [2005/24]AT08.09.2004
FI08.09.2004
IE08.09.2004
GR08.12.2004
SE08.12.2004
Former [2005/18]AT08.09.2004
FI08.09.2004
GR08.12.2004
SE08.12.2004
Former [2005/13]AT08.09.2004
FI08.09.2004
SE08.12.2004
Former [2005/11]FI08.09.2004
SE08.12.2004
Former [2005/10]SE08.12.2004
Cited inInternational search[X]WO9614836  (INCELL [US]) [X] 1-84 * page 4, paragraph 1 - page 7, paragraph 1 * * page 10, paragraph 1 - page 22 *;
 [DX]WO9707826  (CBR LAB INC [US], et al) [DX] 1-84 * the whole document *;
 [X]WO9506129  (THEREXSYS LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1-84 * the whole document *;
 [DX]  - HELLER ET AL, "IN VIVO GENE ELECTROINJECTION AND EXPRESSION IN RAT LIVER", FEBS LETTERS, (1996), vol. 389, pages 225 - 228, XP002058383 [DX] 1-84 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0014-5793(96)00590-X
 [X]  - NISHI ET AL, "HIGH-EFFICIENCY IN VIVO GENE TRANSFER USING INTRAARTERIAL PLASMID DNA INJECTION FOLLOWING IN VIVO ELECTROPORATION", CANCER RESEARCH, (1996), vol. 56, pages 1050 - 1055, XP002058384 [X] 1-84 * the whole document *
Examination WO9843702