Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1015395

EP1015395 - LEAD-FREE GLAZE FOR CERAMIC ARTICLES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  04.07.2003
Database last updated on 19.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip04.07.2003Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 20.08.2003  [2003/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
British Ceramic Research Limited
Queens Road Penkhull Stoke-on-Trent
Staffordshire ST4 7LQ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/27]For all designated states
British Ceramic Research Limited
Queens Road Penkhull
Stoke-on-Trent Staffordshire ST4 7LQ / GB
Inventor(s)01 / CAMPBELL, Ian, Francis-British Ceramic Res. Ltd.
Queens Road, Penkhull
Stoke-on-Trent, Stattfordshire ST4 7LQ / GB
02 / DUKES, David, John-British Ceramic Research Ltd.
Queens Road, Penkhull, Stoke-on-Trent
Stattfordshire ST4 7LQ / GB
[2000/27]
Representative(s)Sales, Robert Reginald
Swindell & Pearson Limited 48 Friar Gate
Derby DE1 1GY / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/27]Sales, Robert Reginald
Swindell & Pearson, 48 Friar Gate
Derby DE1 1GY / GB
Application number, filing date98935131.716.07.1998
[2000/27]
WO1998GB02114
Priority number, dateGB1997001544623.07.1997         Original published format: GB 9715446
[2000/27]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9905070
Date:04.02.1999
Language:EN
[1999/05]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1015395
Date:05.07.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.02.1999
[2000/27]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP04.02.1999
ClassificationInternational:C03C8/02, C03C8/14
[2000/27]
Designated contracting statesGB [2000/27]
TitleGerman:BLEIFREIE GLASUREN FÜR KERAMISCHE GEGENSTÄNDE[2000/27]
English:LEAD-FREE GLAZE FOR CERAMIC ARTICLES[2000/27]
French:VERNIS SANS PLOMB POUR ARTICLES EN CERAMIQUE[2000/27]
Entry into regional phase22.02.2000National basic fee paid 
22.02.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
22.02.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure03.02.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
22.02.2000Examination requested  [2000/27]
15.06.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
04.10.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.02.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2003/34]
07.03.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2003/34]
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.07.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
16.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.200205   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[X]GB2250740  (BRITISH CERAMIC RES LTD [GB]) [X] 1-9,11-13,16-19,28-35,40-45,47-52 * page 3 - page 10; example J; claim - *;
 [A]WO9509132  (FERRO CORP [US]) [A] 1-9,11-13,18-21,24-29,40-52 * page 2, line 5 - page 6, line 6 * * claim - *;
 [A]US2389386  (RUSSELL JR RALSTON) [A] 1-9,11-52 * page 3, line 54 - page 4, line 42 * * claim - *;
 [A]EP0509792  (COOKSON GROUP PLC [GB]) [A] 1-9,11-52 * example -; claim - *