EP1000033 - HETEROCYCLIC DERIVATIVES WHICH INHIBIT FACTOR XA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.03.2005 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.03.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.04.2005 [2005/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AstraZeneca AB 151 85 Södertälje / SE | [2000/35] |
Former [2000/20] | For all designated states AstraZeneca UK Limited 15 Stanhope Gate London W1Y 6LN / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JAMES, Roger Alderley Park Macclesfield, Cheshire SK10 4TG / GB | 02 /
NOWAK, Thorsten Alderley Park Macclesfield, Cheshire SK10 4TG / GB | 03 /
WARNER, Peter Alderley Park Macclesfield, Cheshire SK10 4TG / GB | [2000/20] | Representative(s) | Brown, Andrew Stephen AstraZeneca PLC Global Intellectual Property Mereside, Alderley Park Macclesfield, Cheshire SK10 4TG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/20] | Brown, Andrew Stephen AstraZeneca PLC Global Intellectual Property Mereside, Alderley Park Macclesfield, Cheshire SK10 4TG / GB | Application number, filing date | 98935208.3 | 23.07.1998 | [2000/20] | WO1998GB02210 | Priority number, date | GB19970015894 | 29.07.1997 Original published format: GB 9715894 | [2000/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9906371 | Date: | 11.02.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1000033 | Date: | 17.05.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.02.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1000033 | Date: | 06.05.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.02.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C07D213/82, A61K31/455 | [2000/20] | CPC: |
C07D213/82 (EP,US);
C07D213/38 (KR);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P7/02 (EP);
C07D213/71 (KR);
C07D237/08 (KR);
C07D237/18 (KR);
C07D239/26 (KR);
C07D239/38 (KR);
C07D253/02 (KR);
C07D257/08 (KR);
C07D403/04 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/20] | Title | German: | HETEROCYCLISCHE VERBINDUNGEN ALS FAKTOR XA INHIBITOREN | [2000/20] | English: | HETEROCYCLIC DERIVATIVES WHICH INHIBIT FACTOR XA | [2000/20] | French: | DERIVES HETEROCYCLIQUES INHIBANT LE FACTEUR XA | [2000/20] | Entry into regional phase | 29.02.2000 | National basic fee paid | 29.02.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.02.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.02.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 29.02.2000 | Examination requested [2000/20] | 20.03.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.06.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.01.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.03.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.05.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.08.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 07.08.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP03018010.3 / EP1367054 | Opposition(s) | 08.02.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO9610022 (ZENECA LTD [GB], et al) [Y] 1-9 * page 111; table IV *; | [PY]WO9728129 (ZENECA LTD [GB], et al) [PY] 1-9* pages 31-34; claim 1 *; | [PY]WO9821188 (ZENECA LTD [GB], et al) [PY] 1-9 * pages 19-23; claim 1 *; | [Y] - KUNITADA S ET AL, "FACTOR XA INHIBITORS", CURRENT PHARMACEUTICAL DESIGN, (199610), vol. 2, no. 5, pages 531 - 542, XP002057653 [Y] 1-9 * page 539 * |