Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0995296

EP0995296 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR IMPROVING HANDOFF IN A CELLULAR NETWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  18.06.2004
Database last updated on 13.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip18.06.2004Refusal of applicationpublished on 04.08.2004  [2004/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Nortel Networks Limited
2351 Boulevard Alfred-Nobel
St. Laurent, QC H4S 2A9 / CA
[N/P]
Former [2003/41]For all designated states
Nortel Networks Limited
2351 Boulevard Alfred-Nobel
St. Laurent, Quebec H4S 2A9 / CA
Former [2000/39]For all designated states
Nortel Networks Limited
World Trade Center of Montreal, 380 St. Antoine Street West, 8th floor
Montreal, Quebec H2Y 3Y4 / CA
Former [2000/17]For all designated states
NORTEL NETWORKS CORPORATION
World Trade Center of Montreal 380 St. Antoine Street West 8th Floor
Montreal, Quebec H2Y 3Y4 / CA
Inventor(s)01 / SATARASINGHE, Prasanna, Jayaraj
7512 Brownley Place
Plano, TX 75025 / US
[2000/17]
Representative(s)Loven, Keith James , et al
Loven
Patents & Trademarks
West Central
Runcorn Road
Lincoln LN6 3QP / GB
[N/P]
Former [2001/41]Loven, Keith James , et al
Loven & Co Quantum House 30 Tentercroft Street
Lincoln LN5 7DB / GB
Former [2000/18]Dearling, Bruce Clive , et al
Hepworth Lawrence Bryer & Bizley, Merlin House, Falconry Court, Bakers Lane
Epping, Essex CM16 5DQ / GB
Former [2000/17]Funnell, Samantha Jane , et al
Hepworth Lawrence Bryer & Bizley Merlin House Falconry Court Bakers Lane
Epping, Essex CM16 5DQ / GB
Application number, filing date98935231.522.06.1998
[2000/17]
WO1998IB01200
Priority number, dateUS1997089022709.07.1997         Original published format: US 890227
[2000/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO9903245
Date:21.01.1999
Language:EN
[1999/03]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0995296
Date:26.04.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.01.1999
[2000/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP01.04.1999
ClassificationInternational:H04M1/00
[2000/17]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2000/17]
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR WEITERREICHENVERBESSERUNG IN EINEM ZELLULAREN NETZWERK[2000/17]
English:METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR IMPROVING HANDOFF IN A CELLULAR NETWORK[2000/17]
French:PROCEDE PERMETTANT D'ACCROITRE LES CAPACITES D'UN RESEAU CELLULAIRE AINSI QUE D'AMELIORER SES PERFORMANCES ET DISPOSITIF CORRESPONDANT[2000/17]
Entry into regional phase18.01.2000National basic fee paid 
18.01.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
18.01.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure26.01.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
18.01.2000Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
18.01.2000Examination requested  [2000/17]
16.07.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
25.11.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.03.2004Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2004/32]
13.03.2004Application refused, date of legal effect [2004/32]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
22.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
20.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
28.05.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
Cited inInternational search[A]EP0701382  (AT & T CORP [US]) [A] 1 * abstract * * column 8, line 13 - line 39 *;
 [A]US5267261  (BLAKENEY II ROBERT D [US], et al) [A] 2,3,6,9-13 * abstract * * column 3, line 25 - column 4, line 43 *;
 [A]US5428816  (BARNETT CHARLES A [US], et al) [A] 9-13 * abstract * * column 2, line 14 - line 60 *;
 [A]US5327575  (MENICH BARRY J [US], et al) [A] 3,6,9 * abstract * * column 4, line 44 - line 63 *
 [A]  - CHANG SOON KANG ET AL, "CDMA MOBILE COMMUNICATION SYSTEM PERFORMANCE ANALYSIS TOOLS FOR NETWORK PARAMETER PLANNING", 1996 IEEE 46TH. VEHICULAR TECHNOLOGY CONFERENCE, MOBILE TECHNOLOGY FOR THE HUMAN RACE ATLANTA, APR. 28 - MAY 1, 1996, INSTITUTE OF ELECTRICAL AND ELECTRONICS ENGINEERS, (19960428), vol. 2, no. CONF. 46, pages 894 - 898, XP000593104 [A] 1 * page 896, column 2, line 10 - line 48 *