Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1003507

EP1003507 - COMBINATION THERAPY COMPRISING AMLODIPINE AND A STATIN COMPOUND [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  14.04.2006
Database last updated on 12.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip14.04.2006Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 31.05.2006  [2006/22]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Pfizer Products Inc.
Eastern Point Road
Groton, CT 06340 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/22]For all designated states
Pfizer Products Inc.
Eastern Point Road
Groton, Connecticut 06340 / US
Inventor(s)01 / BUCH, Jan
Unit 6, 48 Spring Street
Greenwich, CT 06830 / US
02 / SCOTT, Robert, Andrew, Donald
302 Riverside Avenue
Riverside, CT 06878 / US
[2000/22]
Representative(s)Hayles, James Richard , et al
Pfizer
ATTENTION: ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR / FR
[N/P]
Former [2000/22]Hayles, James Richard , et al
Pfizer Limited, Patents Department, Ramsgate Road
Sandwich Kent CT13 9NJ / GB
Application number, filing date98935246.310.08.1998
[2000/22]
WO1998IB01220
Priority number, dateUS19970057555P29.08.1997         Original published format: US 57555 P
[2000/22]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9911263
Date:11.03.1999
Language:EN
[1999/10]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1003507
Date:31.05.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.03.1999
[2000/22]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP11.03.1999
ClassificationInternational:A61K31/44
[2000/22]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/22]
Extension statesAL07.02.2000
LT07.02.2000
LV07.02.2000
MK07.02.2000
RO07.02.2000
SI07.02.2000
TitleGerman:KOMBINATIONSTHERAPIE, ENTHALTEND AMLOPIDIN UND EIN STATIN[2000/22]
English:COMBINATION THERAPY COMPRISING AMLODIPINE AND A STATIN COMPOUND[2000/22]
French:THERAPIE COMBINEE COMPRENANT DE L'AMLODIPINE ET UN COMPOSE DE STATINE[2000/22]
Entry into regional phase07.02.2000National basic fee paid 
07.02.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
07.02.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure18.01.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
07.02.2000Examination requested  [2000/22]
20.01.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
28.10.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.06.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
04.08.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.09.2004Observations by third parties
27.06.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.07.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.07.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
29.11.2005Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2006/22]
02.01.2006Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2006/22]
Request for further processing for:28.10.2003Request for further processing filed
28.10.2003Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
12.11.2003Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.08.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
20.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
17.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
11.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
19.07.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
31.08.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.08.200205   M06   Fee paid on   17.10.2002
Cited inInternational search[X]EP0709098  (CADILA LAB LTD [IN]) [X] 1-69 *cf. page 3, lines 20-30 in connection with page 4, lines 8-13 (item 4), page 6, lines 50-55, page 7, lines 3-6*;
 [X]US5616593  (PATEL RAMANBHAI B [IN], et al) [X] 1-69 *cf. col. 3, lines 40-56 (item 4), col. 6, lines 4-23*;
 [X]DE19539363  (BASF AG [DE]) [X] 1-69 *cf. col. 1, first para., col. 2, lines 20-24, col. 5, lines 34-49*;
 [X]  - JUKEMA W.J., ET AL., "Evidence for a synergistic effect of calcium channel blockers with lipid-lowering therapy in retarding progression of coronary atherosclerosis in symptomatic patients with normal to moderately raised cholesterol levels", ARTERIOSCLEROSIS, THROMBOSIS AND VASCULAR BIOLOGY, (199603), vol. 16, no. 3, pages 425 - 430, XP002084182 [X] 1-69 *cf. abstract, page 426, right col., 2nd para., page 429, right col., last para..*
 [X]  - DAVIS B.R., CUTLER J.A., ET AL., "Rationale and design for the antihypertensive and lipid lowering treatment to prevent heart attack trial (ALLHAT)", AMERICAN JOURNAL OF HYPERTENSION, (199604), vol. 9, no. 4(part 1), pages 342 - 360, XP002084270 [X] 1-69 *cf. abstract, page 345, left col., lines 5-13, right col., 1st para. and table 1*

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0895-7061(96)00037-4
other   - SACKS F.M. ET AL., "Baseline characteristics in the cholesterol and recurrent events (CARE) trial of secondary prevention in patients with average serum cholesterol levels", AM. J. OF CARDIOLOGY, (19950315), vol. 75, pages 621 - 623, XP002989217

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0002-9149(99)80631-6
    - SCANDINAVIAN SIMVASTATIN SURVIVAL STUDY GROUP, "Randomised trial of cholesterol lowering in 4444 patients with coronary heart disease: the Scandinavian Simvastatin Survival Study (4S)", THE LANCET, (19941119), vol. 344, pages 1383 - 1389, XP002989218
    - MRC/BHF HEART PROTECTION STUDY COLLABORATIVE GROUP, "MRC/BHF heart protection study of cholesterol-lowering therapy and of antioxidant vitamin supplementation in a wide range of patients at increased risk of coronary heart disease death: early safety and efficacy experience", EUROPEAN HEART JOURNAL, (1999), vol. 20, pages 725 - 741, XP002989219

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1053/euhj.1998.1350