Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1003551

EP1003551 - ANTIGEN DELIVERY SYSTEM COMPRISING MONOGLYCERIDE OR DIGLYCERIDE DERIVATIVES AS ADJUVANT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  20.04.2007
Database last updated on 15.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip11.12.2009Change - representativepublished on 13.01.2010  [2010/02]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Lyfjathroun H.F. The Icelandic Bio Pharmaceutical Group
P.O. Box 7171
127 Reykjavik / IS
[2006/24]
Former [2000/22]For all designated states
Lyfjathroun H.F. The Icelandic Bio Pharmaceutical Group
P.O. Box 7171
127 Reykjavik / IS
Inventor(s)01 / GIZURARSON, Sveinbjörn
Kaplaskjólsvegur 37
IS-107 Reykjavik / IS
02 / GUDMUNDSDOTTIR, Vera
Laugarnesvegi 92
IS-105 Reykjavik / IS
 [2006/24]
Former [2000/22]01 / GIZURARSON, Sveinbjörn
Kaplaskj(RTM)lsvegur 37
IS-107 Reykjavik / IS
02 / GUDMUNDSD TTIR, Vera
Laugarnesvegi 92
IS-105 Reykjavik / IS
Representative(s)Christiansen, Ejvind , et al
Zacco Denmark A/S
Hans Bekkevolds Allé 7
2900 Hellerup / DK
[N/P]
Former [2010/02]Christiansen, Ejvind , et al
Zacco Denmark A/S Hans Bekkevolds Allé 7
2900 Hellerup / DK
Former [2003/03]Christiansen, Ejvind , et al
Zacco Denmark A/S Hans Bekkevolds Allé 7
2900 Hellerup / DK
Former [2003/02]Pedersen, Tenna Marian , et al
ZACCO DENMARK A/S Hans Bekkevolds Allé 7
2900 Hellerup / DK
Former [2000/22]Rindorf, Hans Joergen , et al
Hofman-Bang A/S Hans Bekkevolds Allé 7
2900 Hellerup / DK
Application number, filing date98935262.009.07.1998
[2000/22]
WO1998IS00006
Priority number, dateIS1997045189709.07.1997         Original published format: IS 451897
[2000/22]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO9902186
Date:21.01.1999
Language:EN
[1999/03]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1003551
Date:31.05.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.01.1999
[2000/22]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1003551
Date:14.06.2006
Language:EN
[2006/24]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:SE01.04.1999
ClassificationInternational:A61K39/39, A61K9/107, A61K47/14
[2000/22]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/22]
Extension statesLT28.12.1999
LV26.12.1999
TitleGerman:ANTIGEN ENTHALTENDE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG, DIE ZUSÄTZLICH DERIVATISIERTE MONOGLYCERIDE ODER DIGLYCERIDE ALS ADJUVANTIEN ENTHÄLT[2006/01]
English:ANTIGEN DELIVERY SYSTEM COMPRISING MONOGLYCERIDE OR DIGLYCERIDE DERIVATIVES AS ADJUVANT[2000/22]
French:SYSTEME D'ADMINISTRATION D'ANTIGENE COMPRENANT DES DERIVES DE MONOGLYCERIDE OU DE DIGLYCERIDE EN TANT QU'ADJUVANTS[2000/22]
Former [2000/22]SYSTEM ZUR VERABREICHUNG VON ANTIGENEN, DAS MONOGLYCERIDE ODER DIGLYCERIDE ALS ADJUVANTIEN ENTHÄLT
Entry into regional phase28.12.1999National basic fee paid 
28.12.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
28.12.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure08.02.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
28.12.1999Examination requested  [2000/22]
16.07.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.11.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.04.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.08.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.03.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
01.09.2005Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
03.11.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.12.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.04.2006Fee for grant paid
10.04.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)15.03.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/21]
Request for further processing for:03.11.2005Request for further processing filed
03.11.2005Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
18.11.2005Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.07.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
09.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
05.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
14.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
14.07.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
13.07.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT14.06.2006
BE14.06.2006
CH14.06.2006
CY14.06.2006
FI14.06.2006
LI14.06.2006
NL14.06.2006
LU09.07.2006
DK14.09.2006
SE14.09.2006
GR15.09.2006
PT14.11.2006
[2009/02]
Former [2008/36]AT14.06.2006
BE14.06.2006
CH14.06.2006
FI14.06.2006
LI14.06.2006
NL14.06.2006
LU09.07.2006
DK14.09.2006
SE14.09.2006
GR15.09.2006
PT14.11.2006
Former [2008/21]AT14.06.2006
BE14.06.2006
CH14.06.2006
FI14.06.2006
LI14.06.2006
NL14.06.2006
DK14.09.2006
SE14.09.2006
GR15.09.2006
PT14.11.2006
Former [2007/22]AT14.06.2006
BE14.06.2006
CH14.06.2006
FI14.06.2006
LI14.06.2006
NL14.06.2006
DK14.09.2006
SE14.09.2006
PT14.11.2006
Former [2007/18]AT14.06.2006
BE14.06.2006
CH14.06.2006
FI14.06.2006
LI14.06.2006
NL14.06.2006
SE14.09.2006
PT14.11.2006
Former [2007/03]AT14.06.2006
CH14.06.2006
FI14.06.2006
LI14.06.2006
SE14.09.2006
Former [2007/02]AT14.06.2006
FI14.06.2006
SE14.09.2006
Former [2006/49]SE14.09.2006
Cited inInternational search[X]US4911928  (WALLACH DONALD F H [US]);
 [X]US4349540  (D HINTERLAND LUCIEN D, et al);
 [X]WO9218147  (AFFINITY BIOTECH INC [US]);
 [X]WO9408604  (AFFINITY BIOTECH INC [US], et al);
 [X]US5633226  (OWEN ALBERT J [US], et al);
 [X]WO9624374  (US ARMY [US]);
 [A]US5561062  (VARANELLI CAROL [US], et al);
 [A]EP0781559  (CHEMO SERO THERAPEUT RES INST [JP]);
 [Y]WO9417827  (LYFJATHROUN H F [IS], et al);
 [A]EP0324455  (RIBI HANS O);
 [X]WO9622109  (SEPPIC SA [FR], et al);
 [X]US4567161  (POSANSKI ULRICH [DE], et al);
 [X]GB822718  (PHILIPS ELECTRICAL IND LTD);
 [X]US4681900  (IWASAKI TETSUJI [JP]);
 [A]US4420484  (GORMAN WILLIAM G [US], et al);
 [A]EP0275709  (OBRERO FAUSTINO P [PH], et al);
 [T]WO9321293  (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US], et al)
 [A]  CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Volume 126, No. 21, 26 May 1997, (Columbus, Ohio, USA), AGGERBECK HENRIK et al., "Intranasal Booster Vaccination Against Diphtheria and Tetanus in Man", page 1, Abstract No. 276069; & VACCINE, 1997, 15(3), 307-316.,
 [A]  CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Volume 125, No. 17, 21 October 1996, (Columbus, Ohio, USA), GIZURARSON SVEINBJORN et al., "Intranasal Vaccination Against Influenza Using Pharmaceutical Excipients as Immunological Adjuvants", page 1, Abstract No. 214403; & VACCINE RES., 1996, 5(2), 69-75.,
 [A]  CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Volume 124, No. 14, 1 April 1996, (Columbus, Ohio, USA), FRISCH BENOIT et al., "Synthesis of Short Polyoxyethylene-Based Heterobifunctional Crosslinking Reagents. Application to the Coupling of Peptides to Liposomes", page 1, Abstract No. 185293; & BIOCONJUGATE CHEM., 1996, 7(2), 180-186.,
 [A]  CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Volume 125, No. 7, 12 August 1996, (Columbus, Ohio, USA), BOECKLER CHRISTOPHE et al., "Immunogenicity of New Heterobifunctional Crosslinking Reagents Used in the Conjugation of Synthetic Peptides to Liposomes", page 1, Abstract No. 7774; & J. IMMUNMOL. METHODS, 1996, 191(1), 1-10.,