blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1009962

EP1009962 - METHOD AND APPARATUS OF INCREASING EFFICIENCY IN THE FREEZING OF INDIVIDUAL ITEMS OF FOOD IN A FREEZING TUNNEL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2000/25]METHOD OF INCREASING EFFICIENCY IN THE FREEZING OF INDIVIDUAL ITEMS OF FOOD IN A FREEZING TUNNEL
[2003/19]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  22.10.2004
Database last updated on 23.04.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip14.03.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT, PT
published on 16.04.2008  [2008/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Arnason, Ingolfur
Soleyjargoetu 14
300 Akranes / IS
[2000/25]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[2000/25]
Representative(s)Plougmann Vingtoft a/s
Strandvejen 70
2900 Hellerup / DK
[N/P]
Former [2000/25]Plougmann, Vingtoft & Partners A/S
Sankt Annae Plads 11, P.O. Box 3007
1021 Copenhagen K / DK
Application number, filing date98935263.810.07.1998
[2000/25]
WO1998IS00007
Priority number, dateIS1997045229711.07.1997         Original published format: IS 452297
[2000/25]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9902932
Date:21.01.1999
Language:EN
[1999/03]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1009962
Date:21.06.2000
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.01.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2000/25]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1009962
Date:17.12.2003
Language:EN
[2003/51]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:SE21.01.1999
ClassificationIPC:F25D23/06, A23L3/36
[2000/25]
CPC:
F25D13/067 (EP,US); A23L3/362 (EP,US); F25D25/04 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/25]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM ERHÖHEN DER LEISTUNGSFÄHIGKEIT BEIM GEFRIEREN EINZELNER NAHRUNGSMITTELGEGENSTÄNDE IN EINEM GEFRIERTUNNEL[2003/19]
English:METHOD AND APPARATUS OF INCREASING EFFICIENCY IN THE FREEZING OF INDIVIDUAL ITEMS OF FOOD IN A FREEZING TUNNEL[2003/19]
French:TECHNIQUE ET DISPOSITIF VISANT A ACCROITRE LA CAPACITE DE CONGELATION DE DENREES ALIMENTAIRES DANS UN TUNNEL DE CONGELATION[2003/19]
Former [2000/25]VERFAHREN ZUM ERHÖHEN DER LEISTUNGSFÄHIGKEIT BEIM GEFRIEREN EINZELNER NAHRUNGSMITTELGEGENSTÄNDE IN EINEM GEFRIERTUNNEL
Former [2000/25]METHOD OF INCREASING EFFICIENCY IN THE FREEZING OF INDIVIDUAL ITEMS OF FOOD IN A FREEZING TUNNEL
Former [2000/25]TECHNIQUE VISANT A ACCROITRE LA CAPACITE DE CONGELATION DE DENREES ALIMENTAIRES DANS UN TUNNEL DE CONGELATION
Entry into regional phase11.02.2000National basic fee paid 
11.02.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
11.02.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure01.02.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE
11.02.2000Examination requested  [2000/25]
11.09.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.01.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.04.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.10.2003Fee for grant paid
20.10.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)20.09.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/50]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.07.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
23.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
19.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
16.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT17.12.2003
CH17.12.2003
CY17.12.2003
FI17.12.2003
IT17.12.2003
LI17.12.2003
GR17.03.2004
SE17.03.2004
ES28.03.2004
PT17.05.2004
LU10.07.2004
MC31.07.2004
[2008/16]
Former [2007/18]AT17.12.2003
CH17.12.2003
CY17.12.2003
FI17.12.2003
LI17.12.2003
GR17.03.2004
SE17.03.2004
ES28.03.2004
LU10.07.2004
MC31.07.2004
Former [2005/23]AT17.12.2003
CH17.12.2003
FI17.12.2003
LI17.12.2003
GR17.03.2004
SE17.03.2004
ES28.03.2004
LU10.07.2004
MC31.07.2004
Former [2005/22]AT17.12.2003
CH17.12.2003
FI17.12.2003
LI17.12.2003
GR17.03.2004
SE17.03.2004
ES28.03.2004
MC31.07.2004
Former [2004/46]AT17.12.2003
CH17.12.2003
FI17.12.2003
LI17.12.2003
GR17.03.2004
SE17.03.2004
ES28.03.2004
Former [2004/33]AT17.12.2003
CH17.12.2003
FI17.12.2003
LI17.12.2003
GR17.03.2004
SE17.03.2004
Former [2004/31]AT17.12.2003
FI17.12.2003
SE17.03.2004
Former [2004/26]FI17.12.2003
SE17.03.2004
Former [2004/24]SE17.03.2004
Cited inInternational search[A]US1865168  (VICTOR BUHR);
 [Y]DE1134688  (LINDE EISMASCH AG);
 [A]US3708995  (BERG D);
 [A]US4409744  (STURGEON LLOYD F [US], et al);
 [Y]EP0602352  (PILLER OSWALD BAECKEREI [DE])
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.