Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0995179

EP0995179 - INTRUDER DETECTOR SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  28.05.2004
Database last updated on 18.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip28.05.2004Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 14.07.2004  [2004/29]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Laser Guard Ltd.
P.O. Box 732
Nazeret-Ilit 17106 / IL
[2000/17]
Inventor(s)01 / FRUCHT, Yaacov
Hageula 2/38
24128 Akko / IL
[2000/17]
Representative(s)Van Malderen, Joëlle , et al
pronovem - Office Van Malderen
Avenue Josse Goffin 158
1082 Bruxelles / BE
[N/P]
Former [2000/17]Van Malderen, Joelle , et al
Office Van Malderen, Place Reine Fabiola 6/1
1083 Bruxelles / BE
Application number, filing date98935573.013.07.1998
[2000/17]
WO1998US14173
Priority number, dateUS1997089345111.07.1997         Original published format: US 893451
[2000/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9903080
Date:21.01.1999
Language:EN
[1999/03]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0995179
Date:26.04.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.01.1999
[2000/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US21.01.1999
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.12.2001
ClassificationInternational:G08B13/181
[2000/17]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/17]
TitleGerman:EINBRUCHDETEKTORSYSTEM[2000/17]
English:INTRUDER DETECTOR SYSTEM[2000/17]
French:SYSTEME DE DETECTION D'INTRUS[2000/17]
Entry into regional phase25.01.2000National basic fee paid 
25.01.2000Search fee paid 
25.01.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
25.01.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure10.02.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
28.01.2000Examination requested  [2000/17]
01.07.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
13.01.2004Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/29]
13.02.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2004/29]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.01.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
21.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
19.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
28.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[XY]US4319332  (MEHNERT WALTER) [X] 1-4,6,8,10,12-19,27 * column A; figures 2-5; claim 10 * * column 5, line 1 - line 34 * * column 6, line 25 - line 45 * * column 7, line 18 - column 8, line 63 * * column 10, line 22 - line 39 * * column 10, line 56 - line 66 * * column 11, line 62 - column 12, line 34 * [Y] 7,11;
 [XY]EP0520247  (LEUZE ELECTRONIC GMBH & CO [DE]) [X] 1-4,8,9,20-24,27 * column W * [Y] 25,26;
 [X]EP0645644  (ISRAEL STATE [IL]) [X] 28 * column A; figure 1 *;
 [Y]US5299971  (HART FRANK J [US]) [Y] 7,11,25,26 * column A; figures 1-3 * * column 4, line 37 - column 5, line 15 * * column 7, line 3 - line 29 *
International search[A]US4967183  (D AMBROSIA GEORGE C [US], et al);
 [A]US5365218  (OTTO ULRICH [DE])