EP0991754 - PROTEASES FROM GRAM-POSITIVE ORGANISMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 17.03.2006 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.03.2006 | Refusal of application | published on 03.05.2006 [2006/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GENENCOR INTERNATIONAL, INC. 925 Page Mill Road Palo Alto, California 94304 / US | [2000/18] |
Former [2000/15] | For all designated states GENENCOR INTERNATIONAL, INC. 4 Cambridge Place, 1870 South Winton Road Rochester, New York 14618 / US | ||
For all designated states Genencor International B.V. Verrijn Stuartlaan 1 2288 EK Rijswijk / EP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ESTELL, David, A. 248 Woodbridge Circle San Mateo, CA 94403 / US | [2000/15] | Representative(s) | Kiddle, Simon John, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/15] | Kiddle, Simon John, et al Mewburn Ellis, York House, 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 98935681.1 | 14.07.1998 | [2000/15] | WO1998US14647 | Priority number, date | EP19970305232 | 15.07.1997 Original published format: EP 97305232 | [2000/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9903984 | Date: | 28.01.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/04] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0991754 | Date: | 12.04.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.01.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.04.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/00 | [2000/15] | CPC: |
C12N9/54 (EP);
C11D3/38663 (EP);
C12N15/75 (EP);
C12N9/18 (EP);
C12N9/48 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/15] | Title | German: | PROTEASEN VON GRAM-POSITIEVE ORGANISMEN | [2000/15] | English: | PROTEASES FROM GRAM-POSITIVE ORGANISMS | [2000/15] | French: | PROTEASES POUR ORGANISMES GRAM-POSITIFS | [2000/15] | Entry into regional phase | 04.02.2000 | National basic fee paid | 04.02.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.02.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.01.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 04.02.2000 | Examination requested [2000/15] | 09.05.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.09.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.12.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.07.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 05.10.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.07.2005 | Date of oral proceedings | 17.11.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2006/18] | 17.11.2005 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 27.11.2005 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2006/18] | Request for further processing for: | 05.10.2004 | Request for further processing filed | 05.10.2004 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 20.10.2004 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]EP0369817 (BIOTEKNIKA INTERNATIONAL) [Y] 1-7,11-16 * the whole document *; | [A] - LEVINE A ET AL, "A 10.3 kbp segment from nprB to argJ at the 102 region of the Bacillus subtilis chromosome", MICROBIOLOGY, (199701), vol. 143, pages 175 - 177, XP002080812 [A] * page 177, column L, paragraph 2; table 2 * | [A] - EMBL/GENBANK/DDBJ DATABASES Accession no P70948, Sequence reference P70948 1 February 1997 LEVINE A ET AL: "YITV", XP002080814 | [PXY] - KUNST F. ET AL, "The complete genome sequence of the Gram-positive bacterium Bacillus subtilis", NATURE, (19971120), vol. 390, pages 249 - 256, XP002080813 [PX] 9,10 * see Table 1, part II.2 * [Y] 1-7,11-16 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/36786 | [PXY] - EMBL/GENBANK/DDBJ DATABASES Accession no O32120, Sequence reference O32120 1 January 1998, XP002080815 [PX] 9,10 * the whole document * [Y] 1-7,11-16 |