Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1023818

EP1023818 - LOW-VOLTAGE NON-THERMIONIC BALLAST-FREE FLUORESCENT LIGHT SYSTEM AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  21.05.2004
Database last updated on 16.06.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip21.05.2004Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 07.07.2004  [2004/28]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
PARRA, Jorge M.
5210 Sycamore Drive
New Port Richey, FL 34654 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/31]For all designated states
Parra, Jorge M.
5210 Sycamore Drive
New Port Richey, FL 34654 / US
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[2000/31]
Representative(s)Jones, Graham Henry
Graham Jones & Company
77 Beaconsfield Road
Blackheath, London SE3 7LG / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/31]Jones, Graham Henry
Graham Jones & Company 77 Beaconsfield Road
Blackheath, London SE3 7LG / GB
Application number, filing date98935753.824.07.1998
[2000/31]
WO1998US14810
Priority number, dateUS19970053796P25.07.1997         Original published format: US 53796 P
US1997094267002.10.1997         Original published format: US 942670
[2000/31]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9905890
Date:04.02.1999
Language:EN
[1999/05]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1023818
Date:02.08.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.02.1999
[2000/31]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US04.02.1999
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.06.2003
ClassificationInternational:H05B37/00, H05B41/282
[2003/33]
Former International [2000/31]H05B37/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/31]
TitleGerman:NIEDERSPANNUNGSLEUCHTSTOFFLAMPENSYSTEM UND VERFAHREN OHNE GLÜHSTARTER ODER VORSCHALTGERÄT[2000/31]
English:LOW-VOLTAGE NON-THERMIONIC BALLAST-FREE FLUORESCENT LIGHT SYSTEM AND METHOD[2000/31]
French:SYSTEME ET PROCEDE D'ECLAIRAGE FLUORESCENT BASSE TENSION NON THERMOIONIQUE EXEMPT DE BALLAST[2000/31]
Entry into regional phase05.10.1999National basic fee paid 
05.10.1999Search fee paid 
05.10.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
05.10.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure05.10.1999Examination requested  [2000/31]
15.11.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/28]
30.01.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2004/28]
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.07.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
24.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
25.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
21.09.1999AT   M01   Fee paid on   05.10.1999
21.09.1999BE   M01   Fee paid on   05.10.1999
21.09.1999CH   M01   Fee paid on   05.10.1999
21.09.1999CY   M01   Fee paid on   05.10.1999
21.09.1999DE   M01   Fee paid on   05.10.1999
21.09.1999DK   M01   Fee paid on   05.10.1999
21.09.1999ES   M01   Fee paid on   05.10.1999
21.09.1999FI   M01   Fee paid on   05.10.1999
21.09.1999FR   M01   Fee paid on   05.10.1999
21.09.1999GB   M01   Fee paid on   05.10.1999
21.09.1999GR   M01   Fee paid on   05.10.1999
21.09.1999IE   M01   Fee paid on   05.10.1999
21.09.1999IT   M01   Fee paid on   05.10.1999
21.09.1999LU   M01   Fee paid on   05.10.1999
21.09.1999MC   M01   Fee paid on   05.10.1999
21.09.1999NL   M01   Fee paid on   05.10.1999
21.09.1999PT   M01   Not yet paid
21.09.1999SE   M01   Not yet paid
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
21.09.1999M01   Fee paid on   05.10.1999
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.200306   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0748147  (VELASCO VALCKE FRANCISCO J [CO]) [X] 1-4,20,32 * column 3, line 36 - column 7, line 27; figures 1-3 *;
 [X]US5491387  (SAITO SHIGERU [JP]) [X] 1-4,20,32 * column 4, line 9 - column 14, line 56; figures 1-32 *;
 [A]US4266167  (PROUD JOSEPH M, et al) [A] 5,6,8,9,15-17,19,21,22,26,27,34,35 * abstract *;
 [A]US5578907  (TAO KUANG Z [SG], et al);
 [A]US4074172  (WESSELINK GUSTAAF ADOLF, et al);
 [A]EP0650312  (VELASCO VALCKE FRANCISCO J [CO]);
 [A]US4904904  (ZARATE HUMBERTO T [US]);
 [A]EP0583838  (PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL])
International search[X]US4417181  (LEALE LUIS [US])