Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0996689

EP0996689 - PIGMENT DISPERSIONS CONTAINING HYDROXYLATED AB-BLOCK POLYMER DISPERSANT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  24.10.2003
Database last updated on 25.04.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip24.10.2003No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 10.12.2003  [2003/50]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company
1007 Market Street
Wilmington, DE 19898 / US
[N/P]
Former [2002/51]For all designated states
E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY
1007 Market Street
Wilmington Delaware 19898 / US
Former [2000/18]For all designated states
E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY
1007 Market Street
Wilmington Delaware 19898 / US
Inventor(s)01 / SPINELLI, Harry, J.
4604 Big Rock Drive
Wilmington, DE 19801 / US
02 / JAKUBAUSKAS, Henry, L.
17 Nine Gates Road
Chadds Ford, PA 19317 / US
03 / MCINTYRE, Patrick, F.
2931 Rambling Way
Bloomfield Hills, MI 48302 / US
04 / KING, James, G.
1344 Westboro Drive
Birmingham, MI 48009 / US
[2000/18]
Representative(s)Morf, Jan Stefan
Abitz & Partner
Patentanwälte mbB
Postfach 86 01 09
81628 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2001/14]Morf, Jan Stefan, Dr. Dipl.-Chem.
Patentanwälte Abitz und Partner Postfach 86 01 09
81628 München / DE
Former [2000/18]Kuhnen & Wacker
Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH, Alois-Steinecker-Strasse 22
85354 Freising / DE
Application number, filing date98935759.516.07.1998
[2000/18]
WO1998US14835
Priority number, dateUS1997089658817.07.1997         Original published format: US 896588
[2000/18]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9903938
Date:28.01.1999
Language:EN
[1999/04]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0996689
Date:03.05.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.01.1999
[2000/18]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0996689
Date:18.12.2002
Language:EN
[2002/51]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP28.01.1999
ClassificationInternational:C09D153/00
[2000/18]
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   FR,   GB [2000/18]
TitleGerman:PIGMENTDISPERSIONEN WELCHE HYDROXYLIERTE AB-BLOCKPOLYMERE ENTHALTEN[2000/18]
English:PIGMENT DISPERSIONS CONTAINING HYDROXYLATED AB-BLOCK POLYMER DISPERSANT[2000/18]
French:DISPERSION DE PIGMENT CONTENANT UN DISPERSANT POLYMERE SEQUENCE AB HYDROXYLE[2000/18]
Entry into regional phase07.01.2000National basic fee paid 
07.01.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
07.01.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure29.01.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
07.01.2000Examination requested  [2000/18]
18.06.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
19.12.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.03.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
18.07.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.10.2002Fee for grant paid
09.10.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)19.09.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/50]
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.01.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
12.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
12.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[A]US4812517  (WEST MICHAEL W J [US]) [A] 1;
 [A]EP0218436  (DU PONT [US]) [A] 1