Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1001716

EP1001716 - PRESSURE OVERLOAD INDICATOR SYSTEM FOR POWER TOOTHBRUSHES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  04.03.2005
Database last updated on 15.07.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip04.03.2005Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 20.04.2005  [2005/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Optiva Corporation
35301 South East Center Street
Snoqualmie, WA 98065 / US
[2001/34]
Former [2000/21]For all designated states
Optiva corporation
13222 Southeast 30th Street
Bellevue, WA 98005 / US
Inventor(s)01 / MEGINNISS, Stephen, M.
3434 10th Avenue West
Seattle, WA 98119 / US
02 / PLANT, Kent, E., Jr.
4106 128th Avenue Southeast 210
Bellevue, WA 98006 / US
03 / BIXBY, Matthew, D.
6254 Flora Avenue S.
Seattle, WA 98108 / US
04 / GIULIANI, David
8415 Benotho Place
Mercer Island, WA 98040 / US
[2000/44]
Former [2000/21]01 / MEGINNISS, Stephen, M.
3434 10th Avenue West
Seattle, WA 98119 / US
02 / PLANT, Kent, E., Jr.
4106 128th Avenue Southeast 210
Bellevue, WA 98006 / US
03 / BIXBY, Matthew, D.
9400 Ravenna Avenue Northeast 7
Seattle, WA 98115 / US
04 / GIULIANI, David
8415 Benotho Place
Mercer Island, WA 98040 / US
Representative(s)Faulkner, Thomas John , et al
Cleveland
10 Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1BR / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/21]Faulkner, Thomas John , et al
fJ Cleveland, 40-43 Chancery Lane
London WC2A 1JQ / GB
Application number, filing date98935838.720.07.1998
[2000/21]
WO1998US14994
Priority number, dateUS1997090775608.08.1997         Original published format: US 907756
[2000/21]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9907305
Date:18.02.1999
Language:EN
[1999/07]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1001716
Date:24.05.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.02.1999
[2000/21]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US18.02.1999
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.10.2004
ClassificationInternational:A61C17/22, A46B13/02, A46B15/00
[2000/21]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/21]
TitleGerman:DRUCKÜBERLASTANZEIGE FÜR ELEKTRISCHE ZAHNBÜRSTEN[2000/21]
English:PRESSURE OVERLOAD INDICATOR SYSTEM FOR POWER TOOTHBRUSHES[2000/21]
French:SYSTEME D'INDICATEUR DE SURCHARGE DE PRESSION POUR BROSSES A DENTS ELECTRIQUES[2000/21]
Entry into regional phase10.02.2000National basic fee paid 
10.02.2000Search fee paid 
10.02.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
10.02.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure02.03.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
10.02.2000Examination requested  [2000/21]
24.02.2005Application withdrawn by applicant  [2005/16]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.07.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
31.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
31.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
31.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
02.08.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search   [ ] No further relevant documents disclosed
International search[A]US4476604  (WHITE LARRY W [US], et al);
 [A]US4698869  (MIERAU HANS-DIETER [DE], et al);
 [A]US4716614  (JONES ARTHUR R [CA], et al);
 [A]US5282291  (SPIELER ERIC L [US], et al);
 [A]EP0481553  (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]);
 [A]CH609238  (LPA LES PRODUITS ASSOCIES [CH]);
 [A]JPH05237014  (TOKYO ELECTRIC CO LTD);
 [A]JPH05329024  (PHILIPS KK);
 [A]FR2471757  (SIAHOU JOSEPH [FR])
by applicantUS5502861
 US5189751
 US5378153