Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0931306

EP0931306 - APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR RECORDING MUSIC FROM A GUITAR HAVING A DIGITAL RECORDER AND PLAYBACK UNIT LOCATED WITHIN THE GUITAR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  21.09.2001
Database last updated on 15.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip21.09.2001Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 07.11.2001 [2001/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Eagan, Chris S.
670 Eldorado Lane
Las Vegas, NV 89123 / US
[1999/30]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[1999/30]
Representative(s)Downey, William Gerrard
Wilson Gunn 5th Floor Blackfriars House The Parsonage
Manchester M3 2JA / GB
[N/P]
Former [1999/30]Downey, William Gerrard
Wilson, Gunn, M'Caw, 41-51 Royal Exchange, Cross Street
Manchester M2 7BD / GB
Application number, filing date98935947.621.07.1998
[1999/30]
WO1998US15231
Priority number, dateUS1997090171428.07.1997         Original published format: US 901714
[1999/30]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9905669
Date:04.02.1999
Language:EN
[1999/05]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0931306
Date:28.07.1999
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.02.1999
[1999/30]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US04.02.1999
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.05.2001
ClassificationInternational:G10D1/08
[1999/30]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   NL,   PT,   SE [1999/30]
TitleGerman:ANORDNUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM AUFZEICHNEN VON GITARMUSIK MIT EINEM, IN EINEM GITAR MONTIERTEN, DIGITALEN AUZEIGNUNGS- UND WIEDERGABEGERÄT[1999/30]
English:APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR RECORDING MUSIC FROM A GUITAR HAVING A DIGITAL RECORDER AND PLAYBACK UNIT LOCATED WITHIN THE GUITAR[1999/30]
French:DISPOSITIF ET PROCEDE POUR L'ENREGISTREMENT MUSICAL DEPUIS UNE GUITARE AYANT UNE UNITE D'ENREGISTREMENT ET UNE UNITE DE REPRODUCTION NUMERIQUE INTERNES[1999/30]
Entry into regional phase14.04.1999National basic fee paid 
14.04.1999Search fee paid 
14.04.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
02.08.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure02.08.1999Examination requested  [1999/39]
23.08.2001Application withdrawn by applicant  [2001/45]
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.200104   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]JPH08185153  (CASIO COMPUT CO LTD) [X] 1-20 * page 4, column R, line 42 *;
 [Y]JPH0764541  ;
 [Y]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19950731), vol. 1995, no. 06, & JP07064541 A 19950310 (CASIO COMPUT CO LTD) [Y] 1-20 * abstract *
 [Y]  - TADAO YOSHIDA, "THE REWRITABLE MINIDISC SYSTEM", PROCEEDINGS OF THE IEEE,US,IEEE. NEW YORK, (19941001), vol. 82, no. 10, ISSN 0018-9219, pages 1492 - 1500, XP000477672 [Y] 1-20 * page 1492, column L, line 1 - line 2 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/5.326407
International search[A]US4080867  ;
 [A]US5442986  ;
 [A]US4711149