Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0996915

EP0996915 - COUPON DISPENSER AND METHOD FOR GENERATING COUPONS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  08.06.2001
Database last updated on 17.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip08.06.2001Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 25.07.2001 [2001/30]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Matthias, John T.
Suite 155, 1550 East 79th Street
Bloomington, MN 55425 / US
[2000/18]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[2000/18]
Representative(s)Lotti, Giorgio , et al
c/o Ing. Barzanò & Zanardo Milano S.p.A.
Corso Vittorio Emanuele II, 61
10128 Torino / IT
[N/P]
Former [2000/18]Lotti, Giorgio , et al
c/o Ing. Barzanò & Zanardo Milano S.p.A. Corso Vittorio Emanuele II, 61
10128 Torino / IT
Application number, filing date98935977.323.07.1998
[2000/18]
WO1998US15341
Priority number, dateUS19970053510P23.07.1997         Original published format: US 53510 P
[2000/18]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9905630
Date:04.02.1999
Language:EN
[1999/05]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0996915
Date:03.05.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.02.1999
[2000/18]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP04.02.1999
ClassificationInternational:G06F17/60, G07B1/02
[2000/18]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [2000/18]
TitleGerman:COUPONAUSGABEVORRICHTUNG UND METHODE ZUR ERZEUGUNG VON COUPONS[2000/18]
English:COUPON DISPENSER AND METHOD FOR GENERATING COUPONS[2000/18]
French:DISTRIBUTEUR DE BONS DE REDUCTION ET PROCEDE D'EMISSION DE BONS[2000/18]
Entry into regional phase14.02.2000National basic fee paid 
14.02.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
14.02.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure23.02.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
14.02.2000Examination requested  [2000/18]
01.02.2001Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2001/30]
01.03.2001Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2001/30]
07.03.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.200003   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[X]WO9720277  (GEMPSY FRANCE SA [FR], et al) [X] 1-25;
 [X]US4674041  (LEMON CHESTER L [US], et al) [X] 1-25;
 [X]US4896791  (SMITH WILLIAM C [US]) [X] 1-25