blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0990164


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
11.01.2003 No opposition filed within time limit published on  26.02.2003  [2003/09]
18.01.2002 (Expected) grant published on  06.03.2002  [2002/10]
11.12.2001 Communication of intention to grant a patent
30.08.2001 Communication of intention to grant
30.08.2001 Communication of intention to grant a patent
28.06.2001 Renewal fee
24.05.2001 First examination report
21.05.2001 Communication of intention to grant
28.06.2000 Renewal fee
18.02.2000 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  05.04.2000 [2000/14]
18.02.2000 Request for examination filed published on  05.04.2000 [2000/14]
14.12.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
09.12.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
08.03.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
03.02.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
02.10.1998 PCT data prior to European publication