blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP0990164
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP0990164Global Dossier 06.03.2002B1
EP0990164 05.04.2000A1
Priority number Date
DE9801518 04.06.1998
DE19725611 17.06.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AT214163T 15.03.2002T
Priority number Date
DE9801518 04.06.1998
DE19725611 17.06.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DE59803288D 11.04.2002D1
Priority number Date
DE9801518 04.06.1998
DE19725611 17.06.1997
DE59803288 04.06.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO9858269Global Dossier 23.12.1998A1
Priority number Date
DE19725611 17.06.1997
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
DE19725611 08.03.2001C2
DE19725611 28.01.1999A1
Priority number Date
DE19725611 17.06.1997