Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0990164

EP0990164 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR MONITORING A CABLE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  11.01.2003
Database last updated on 24.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip11.01.2003No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 26.02.2003  [2003/09]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1
DE-80333 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/14]For all designated states
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Wittelsbacherplatz 2
80333 München / DE
Inventor(s)01 / KARL, Harald
Ebnerstrasse 15
D-91058 Erlangen / DE
02 / LINDNER, Friedrich
Dippach 6
D-96138 Burgebrach / DE
03 / LINK, Dietmar
Am Uttsberg 13
D-91325 Adelsdorf / DE
[2000/14]
Application number, filing date98936096.104.06.1998
[2000/14]
WO1998DE01518
Priority number, dateDE199712561117.06.1997         Original published format: DE 19725611
[2000/14]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9858269
Date:23.12.1998
Language:DE
[1998/51]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0990164
Date:05.04.2000
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.12.1998
[2000/14]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0990164
Date:06.03.2002
Language:DE
[2002/10]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP23.12.1998
ClassificationInternational:G01R31/02
[2000/14]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   FR,   IT,   LI [2000/14]
TitleGerman:ÜBERWACHUNGSVERFAHREN UND ÜBERWACHUNGSGERÄT FÜR EIN KABEL[2000/14]
English:METHOD AND DEVICE FOR MONITORING A CABLE[2000/14]
French:PROCEDE ET APPAREIL DE SURVEILLANCE D'UN CABLE[2000/14]
Entry into regional phase06.12.1999National basic fee paid 
06.12.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
06.12.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure01.12.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
06.12.1999Examination requested  [2000/14]
30.05.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
04.09.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.12.2001Fee for grant paid
03.12.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)09.12.2002No opposition filed within time limit [2003/09]
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
20.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[DA]WO9011532  (RAYCHEM LTD [GB]) [DA] 1,3 * abstract *;
 [A]WO9011533  (RADIODETECTION LTD [GB]) [A] 1,3 * abstract *;
 [A]JPS5885176  ;
 [A]FR2264288  (FEUILLASSIER ROBERT [FR]) [A] 1,3 * page 2, line 10 - page 3, line 26; figures 1,2 *;
 [A]DE3513846  (QUANTE FERNMELDETECHNIK GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,3 * page 8, line 9 - page 14, line 24; figures 1,2 *;
 [A]JPS59125075
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19830813), vol. 7, no. 184, Database accession no. (P - 216), [A] 1,3 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19841121), vol. 8, no. 254, Database accession no. (P - 315), [A] 5,7 * abstract *