Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0992069 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0992069



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 168
09.07.2003 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
25.07.2002 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
14.03.2002 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
26.02.2002 Request for change of representative Search / examination 2
19.02.2002 Reply to communication about intention to grant Search / examination 1
19.02.2002 Translation of the claims Search / examination 4
19.02.2002 Translation of the claims Search / examination 5
21.12.2001 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 4
17.12.2001 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 1
10.12.2001 Claims Search / examination 1
10.12.2001 Description Search / examination 1
10.12.2001 Disapproval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
20.11.2001 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
20.11.2001 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
20.11.2001 Text intended for grant Search / examination 35
20.09.2001 Claims Search / examination 5
20.09.2001 Description Search / examination 4
20.09.2001 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
17.09.2001 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
05.09.2001 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
16.05.2001 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
16.05.2001 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
02.08.2000 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
06.07.2000 Request for transfer of rights Search / examination 3
01.03.2000 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
30.08.1999 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
12.03.1999 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
18.01.1999 Priority document Search / examination 36
18.12.1998 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 4
18.12.1998 International publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 36