EP0988169 - DEVICE FOR MEASURING THE CONTACT FORCE IN A POWER COLLECTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.05.2005 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.05.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.07.2005 [2005/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DaimlerChrysler Rail Systems GmbH Saatwinkler Damm 43 13627 Berlin / DE | [2001/15] |
Former [2000/13] | For all designated states DaimlerChrysler AG Epplestrasse 225 70567 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BRAND, Werner Treskowstrasse 9 D-13507 Berlin / DE | 02 /
BLASCHKO, René Almstadtstrasse 46 D-10119 Berlin / DE | 03 /
MOLLENHAUER, Olaf Am Wald 4 D-98693 Ilmenau / DE | 04 /
KARGUTH, Andreas Humboldtstrasse 3 D-99867 Gotha / DE | [2000/13] | Representative(s) | Cohausz & Florack Patent- & Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Bleichstrasse 14 40211 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/44] | Cohausz & Florack Patentanwälte Postfach 33 02 29 40435 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [2001/15] | Gmeiner, Christa, c/o DaimlerChrysler AG, et al Intellectual Property Management, Sedanstrasse 10/Geb. 17 89077 Ulm / DE | ||
Former [2000/13] | Lindner-Vogt, Karin, Dipl.-Phys. Daimler-Benz Aktiengesellschaft, Intellectual Property Management, Sedanstrasse 10, Gebäude 17 89077 Ulm / DE | Application number, filing date | 98936201.7 | 12.06.1998 | [2000/13] | WO1998DE01657 | Priority number, date | DE1997125906 | 13.06.1997 Original published format: DE 19725906 | [2000/13] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9856610 | Date: | 17.12.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0988169 | Date: | 29.03.2000 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.12.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.12.1998 | Classification | IPC: | B60L5/28 | [2000/13] | CPC: |
B60L5/28 (EP,KR,US);
B60L2200/26 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IE, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [2000/13] | Title | German: | EINRICHTUNG ZUR MESSUNG DER ANPRESSKRAFT AN EINEM STROMABNEHMER | [2000/13] | English: | DEVICE FOR MEASURING THE CONTACT FORCE IN A POWER COLLECTOR | [2000/13] | French: | DISPOSITIF POUR MESURER LA FORCE DE PRESSION AU NIVEAU D'UN PANTOGRAPHE | [2000/13] | Entry into regional phase | 12.10.1999 | National basic fee paid | 12.10.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.10.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.12.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 22.10.1999 | Examination requested [2000/13] | 01.01.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/27] | 04.02.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2005/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2004 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]DE8811617U (SIEMENS) [A] 1,2 * column W *; | [A]EP0363623 (SIEMENS AG OESTERREICH [AT], et al) [A] 1,2 * abstract *; | [DA]EP0697304 (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [DA] 1 * abstract *; | [AD]US5115405 (CATHALA JACQUES [FR], et al) [AD] 1 * figure - * |