Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0993761

EP0993761 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR MEASURING THE HEIGHT AT WHICH OBJECT EDGES OF COMPONENTS ARE POSITIONED [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  28.06.2003
Database last updated on 24.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip28.06.2003No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 13.08.2003  [2003/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1
DE-80333 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/16]For all designated states
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Wittelsbacherplatz 2
80333 München / DE
Inventor(s)01 / BRODT, Michael
Pellhammerstrasse 4
D-82256 Fürstenfeldbruck / DE
02 / STANZL, Harald
Hunkelestrasse 7
D-81476 München / DE
03 / STOCKMANN, Michael
Enzianweg 18
D-83052 Bruckmühl / DE
[2000/16]
Application number, filing date98936252.025.06.1998
[2000/16]
WO1998DE01752
Priority number, dateDE199712780930.06.1997         Original published format: DE 19727809
[2000/16]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9902024
Date:14.01.1999
Language:DE
[1999/02]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0993761
Date:19.04.2000
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.01.1999
[2000/16]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0993761
Date:21.08.2002
Language:DE
[2002/34]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP14.01.1999
ClassificationInternational:H05K13/04
[2000/16]
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL [2000/16]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR MESSUNG DER HÖHENPOSITION VON OBJEKTKANTEN VON BAUELEMENTEN[2000/16]
English:METHOD AND DEVICE FOR MEASURING THE HEIGHT AT WHICH OBJECT EDGES OF COMPONENTS ARE POSITIONED[2000/16]
French:DISPOSITIF ET PROCEDE DE MESURE DE LA POSITION EN HAUTEUR DE CONNEXIONS DE COMPOSANTS[2000/16]
Entry into regional phase17.12.1999National basic fee paid 
17.12.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
17.12.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure12.01.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
17.12.1999Examination requested  [2000/16]
16.08.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
13.02.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.01.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
18.02.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.05.2002Fee for grant paid
06.05.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)22.05.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/33]
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
20.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
18.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[X]US5559727  (DELEY MICHAEL T [US], et al) [X] 1-3,7-10,12,13,15 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO9718697  (MYDATA AUTOMATION AB [SE], et al) [A] 1,2,4-6 * the whole document *